Pedro v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Pedro
Case Number: 2:2013cv00492
Filed: March 11, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/23/13 APPROVING and ORDERING Plaintiff's time to file his summary judgment on or before 10/18/13. (Meuleman, A)
October 23, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER 16 signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/22/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's time to file her summary judgment motion is hereby EXTENDED from 10/18/2013, to10/23/2013, with all other deadlines extended accordingly. (Kastilahn, A)
September 30, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/30/14 DENYING 18 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 19 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment and close this file. CASE CLOSED. (Meuleman, A)
April 11, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/11/2013 GRANTING plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Clerk directed to serve plaintiff with Judge Kellison's Scheduling Order for Social Security cases and to serve a copy of Order on U.S. Marshal Services. Within 15 days of date of this Order, plaintiff shall submit completed Summons and copies of Complaint to U.S. Marshal for service. Plaintiff shall file a Statement with Court that said papers have submitted to Marshal Services. [cc: U.S. Marshal Services] (Marciel, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pedro v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Pedro
Represented By: Bess M. Brewer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]