Campos, et al v. Federal Home Loan Services Corp., et al

Plaintiff: Raquel Campos and Ignacio Campos
Defendant: Quality Home Loan Services and Federal Home Loan Services Corp.
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00494
Filed: March 12, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Placer
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/15/13 ORDERING that the Status Conference scheduled for 7/24/13, is RESCHEDULED for 10/23/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. On or before 10/9/2013 , the parties shall file Status Reports (or a joint status report) setting forth the matters referenced in the Court's 3/25/13 order. The USM is directed to serve a copy of this order on each defendant, and within 14 days thereafter, shall file a statement with the court that the order has been served. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this order on the USM, 501 I Street, Sacramento, CA 95814 (tel. 916-930-2030).(Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 24, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/24/2013 VACATING the Motion Hearing as to 21 Motion for Default Judgment set for 9/25/2013; RECOMMENDING that 21 Motion for Default Judgment be denied; REFERRING this matter to Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; ORDERING that objections be filed within 14 days. (Michel, G)
October 15, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/15/13: Plaintiffs' October 1, 2013 motion to amend their complaint 33 is granted. This action will proceed on plaintiffs' first amended complaint 33 . Defendants' motions to dismiss 23 , 30 , are denied as moot and the October 30, 2013 hearing thereon is vacated. Defendants shall file a response to plaintiff's amended complaint within the time prescribed in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Kaminski, H)
March 25, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/25/2013 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; DIRECTING The Clerk of Court to issue all process pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 4; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to send the plaintiffs 2 USM-285 forms; 1 Summons, a copy of the 1 Complaint and this Court's New Case Documents; ADVISING the plaintiffs that the U.S. Marshal will require 1 completed Summons, 1 completed USM-285 form per defendant, 1 copy of the Complaint per defendant, plus 1 copy of the Complaint for the U.S. Marshal, and a full set of New Case Documents per defendant; ORDERING the plaintiffs to supply the U.S. Marshal all information necessary to effectuate process within 14 days; ORDERING plaintiffs to file a Statement with the Court that such service has been made; DIRECTING the U.S. Marshal to serve process, without prepayment of cost within 90 days. (cc; USM) (Michel, G)
November 14, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/12/2013 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 32 are ADOPTED in FULL; Plaintiffs' 21 Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED. (Reader, L)
October 16, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/16/14 RECOMMENDING that Defendants' motions to dismiss, 36 42 be granted; Plaintiffs' first amended complaint, 33 be dismissed without leave to amend; and the Clerk be directed to close the case. Referred to Judge Morrison C England, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Campos, et al v. Federal Home Loan Services Corp., et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquel Campos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ignacio Campos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Home Loan Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Services Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]