Novo v. Ashby et al

Plaintiff: Sarah R Novo
Defendant: Angelique Ashby and City of Sacramento
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00521
Filed: March 15, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 05:704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/7/2013 ORDERING plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file a First Amended Complaint no later than 7 days after entry of this order; defendants are to file responsive pleadings or motions thereto within the times provided for by the FRCP; the Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike hearing currently set for 6/17/2013 is VACATED. (Waggoner, D)
July 19, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/18/13 ORDERING that the hearing on Defendant's 16 MOTION to STRIKE is CONTINUED to 8/12/2013 at 10:00 AM. Plaintiff SHALL file an opposition or statement of non-opposition no later than 7/29/13. Defendant MAY file a reply no later than 8/5/13. Counsel for Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing as to why sanctions should not issue in accordance with EDCA Local Rule 110 (2013), including a fine of $150 or judgment for Defendants. Counsel for Plaintiff SHALL file a response to this order to show cause within seven (7) days of the issuance of this order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 30, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/29/13 ORDERING that Defendant's MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Fourth Claim for Relief 16 is GRANTED, only insofar as it presents a retaliation claim against Defendant Ashby pursuant to the CF RA. The hearing on Defendant's MOTION to Strike, currently set for 8/12/13, is VACATED. Plaintiff's counsel is SANCTIONED in the amount of one hundred and fifty dollars ($150). This sum shall be paid to the Clerk of the Court no lat er than thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Counsel for Plaintiff SHALL file an affidavit accompanying the payment of this sanctions which states that it is paid personally by counsel, out of personal funds, and is not and will not be billed, directly or indirectly, to the client or any way made the responsibility of the client as attorneys' fees or costs.(Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Novo v. Ashby et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah R Novo
Represented By: Robert Francis Koehler, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelique Ashby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sacramento
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]