United States of America v. Real Property located at 8263 Fieldpoppy Circle, Sacramento, California, APN: 115-0231-027-0000

Defendant: Real Property located at 8263 Fieldpoppy Circle, Sacramento, California, APN: 115-0231-027-0000
Plaintiff: United States of America
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00527
Filed: March 18, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
 
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/28/13 REFERRING to VDRP. (Manzer, C)
October 8, 2013 22 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/7/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
March 21, 2013 3 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/21/2013 GRANTING government's [1-3] Application for Publication. (Marciel, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property located at 8263 Fieldpoppy Circle, Sacramento, California, APN: 115-0231-027-0000
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 8263 Fieldpoppy Circle, Sacramento, California, APN: 115-0231-027-0000
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]