Barragan v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jennifer Barragan
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00584
Filed: March 25, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
 
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2013 16 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/17/2013 ORDERING plaintiff's time to file a motion for summary judge is HEREBY EXTENDED to 10/21/2013. (Donati, J)
October 16, 2013 18 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER 17 signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/16/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's time to file a motion for summary judgment is EXTENDED to 11/21/2013. (Kastilahn, A)
December 26, 2013 21 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/24/13. Defendant's time to file a response to the motion for summary judgment is extended to 1/22/14. (Manzer, C)
January 24, 2014 23 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/24/2014 ORDERING 22 that the Defendant's time to file a response to Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby EXTENDED 30 days to the new filing date of 2/21/2014.(Reader, L)
March 19, 2014 25 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/18/14 that Plaintiff's 19 motion for summary judgment is granted for purposes of readdressing the medical opinions in the record, plaintiff's credibility, and the resulting residual functional capacity. The Commissioner's 24 cross-motion for summary judgment 24 is denied; and, this matter is remanded for further proceedings consistent with this order. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
July 21, 2014 28 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/21/14 GRANTING payment of plaintiff's attorney fees. (Becknal, R)
April 2, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/2/13 GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in social security cases and to serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Marshal. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shal submit to the U.S. Marshal a completed summons and copies of the complaint and to file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the U.S. Marshal. The U.S. Marshal is DIRECTED to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. (cc:USM). (Meuleman, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Barragan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Patrick William Snyder, GOVT
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Barragan
Represented By: Peter Brixie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]