Simmons v. Superior Court of Sacramento, et al.

Defendant: Lawrence Brown and Superior Court of Sacramento
Plaintiff: Ronald Simmons
Case Number: 2:2013cv00588
Filed: March 26, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Ronald Simmons signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/3/2013. Plaintiff's 3 motion to proceed IFP is GRANTED and plaintiff is required to pay the $350.00 filing fee. The Sheriff is to collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff. The Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: Financial) (Yin, K)
July 29, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/29/2013 ORDERING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing, within 30 days, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim. (Yin, K)
December 13, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/13/13 ORDERING that this action is dismissed for failure to state a claim and for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court rules and orders; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment and close this file. CASE CLOSED. (Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Superior Court of Sacramento, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Court of Sacramento
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Simmons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]