Dupont v. Singh

Respondent: V. Singh
Petitioner: Daniel DuPont
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00606
Filed: March 29, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/29/2013. Within 30 days from date of this Order, petitioner shall either submit $5.00 filing fee or an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Should petitioner fail to comply, the pending 8 Findings and Recommendations will be submitted to District Judge England. (Marciel, M)
December 5, 2013 16 Featured Case FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/4/13 RECOMMENDING that petitioners application for a writ of habeas corpus be summarily denied and this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
March 28, 2013 3 Featured Case ORDER OF TRANSFER to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. The clerk shall transfer this matter forthwith.(Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/28/2013) Modified on 3/28/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).[Transferred from cand on 3/29/2013.]
April 4, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/03/13 ordering petitioner shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis or the appropriate filing fee. The clerk of the court shall send to petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district. (Plummer, M)
May 13, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/13/13 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court is directed to randomly assign this case to a District Judge. It is RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Randomly assigned and referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dupont v. Singh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: V. Singh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel DuPont
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]