Brownrigg, et al. v. IPCO, LLC, et al.

Plaintiff: CommUnique Wireless, LLC and Edwin V. Brownrigg
Defendant: IPCO, LLC and SIPCO, LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00621
Filed: March 29, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Placer
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/19/13: Defendants IPCO, LLC and SIPCO, LLC shall file their response to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before June 28, 2013. (Kaminski, H)
June 27, 2013 13 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/26/2013 ORDERING Defendants IPCO, LLC and SIPCO, LLC to file their response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by 7/30/2013. (Michel, G)
July 25, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/24/13: Defendants IPCO, LLC and SIPCO, LLC shall file their response to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before August 30, 2013. (Kaminski, H)
August 30, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/29/2013 ORDERING that Defendants IPCO, LLC and SIPCO, LLC shall file their response to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before 9/13/2013. (Zignago, K.)
September 16, 2013 19 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/13/13 EXTENDING defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint through and including 10/11/13. After due consideration and for good cause shown, such extension is GRANTED. It is therefore ORDERED that defendants IPCO, LLC and SIPCO, LLC shall file their response to plaintiffs' complaint on or before 10/11/13. (Meuleman, A)
April 5, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/5/2013 ORDERING 8 that defendants shall file their response to plaintiffs' complaint on or before 5/9/2013 (Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brownrigg, et al. v. IPCO, LLC, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CommUnique Wireless, LLC
Represented By: Justin H. Sanders, NCAED
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin V. Brownrigg
Represented By: Justin H. Sanders, NCAED
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPCO, LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Ezgar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIPCO, LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Ezgar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]