Douthitt v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Theresa Douthitt
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00636
Filed: April 2, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
 
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/3/14 GRANTING 14 and 17 Motions for Extension of Time and DENYING 15 Motion to file documents by fax. Motion for Summary Judgment and/or voluntary remand due within 30 days. (Manzer, C)
June 4, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/3/2014 GRANTING 21 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time; ORDERING the defendant to respond to the plaintiff's 20 Motion for Summary Judgment by 6/30/2014. (Michel, G)
June 26, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/26/14 GRANTING 23 Motion to Remand. The Court ORDERS that this case be REMANDED for further proceedings, pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. Section 405(g), and that judgment be entered in favor of Plaintiff. CASE CLOSED. (Meuleman, A)
June 19, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/17/13 ORDERING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing, within 30 days of the date of this order, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to complete service of process. Plaintiff is again warned that failure to respond to this order may result in dismissal of the action for the reasons outlined. (Meuleman, A)
July 30, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/30/13 ORDERING that the Order to Show Cause 4 is DISCHARGED, and this case will proceed in accordance with the Scheduling Order.(Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Douthitt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Represented By: Timothy Bolin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Douthitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]