Capp v. Nordstrom, Inc.

Plaintiff: Robert Capp
Defendant: Nordstrom, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00660
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Placer
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/13/13. Defendant is ORDERED to appear before U.S. Chief District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., in Courtroom 7, 14th floor, in the United States Courthouse, 501 I Street, Sacr amento, California, on Thursday, 7/11/13, at 2:00 p.m., and that Defendant SHOW CAUSE WHY ITS MOTION TO DISMISS SHOULD NOT BE DENIED as not properly before the Court. Alternatively, in the interest of just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of the issues in this case, Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, Defendant may provide a supplemental brief, to be filed and served not less than twenty-eight (28) days before the above hearing date, addressing the following issue: whether Plaintiff states a claim un der Californias Song Beverly Credit Card Act, Cal. Civ. Code § 1747.08. Plaintiff may file and serve an opposition brief not less than fourteen (14) days before the above hearing date. Defendant may file and serve a reply not less than seven (7) days before the above hearing date. Argument may be heard on this issue, and the issues raised in Defendant's motion to dismiss, on Thursday, 7/11/13, at 2:00 p.m. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 22, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying 6 Motion to Dismiss signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/21/13: Plaintiff's Complaint is DEEMED AMENDED to omit his request for injunctive relief and prior demand for a jury trial. (Kaminski, H)
May 29, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/28/14: Discovery due by 10/1/2014. The last day to hear summary judgment motions as to individual claims shall be 12/4/14. (Kaminski, H)
September 29, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/26/14. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capp v. Nordstrom, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Capp
Represented By: James M. Lindsay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordstrom, Inc.
Represented By: Dana James Dunwoody
Represented By: Brian Richard Blackman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]