Commissioner of Social Security v. Colvin

Plaintiff: James D.A. Smith
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00665
Filed: April 5, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
 
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/5/13: The deadline for the filing of Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and/or remand is extended thirty (30) days. All other deadlines and scheduling matters set forth in the Courts May 1, 2013 Scheduling Order remain the same. (Kaminski, H)
December 13, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/13/13 ORDERING that Defendant's MOTION for a stay of proceeding pending resolution of the recent lapse in government funding 11 is DENIED as moot. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 5, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/4/14 GRANTING nunc pro tunc 19 Motion for Extension, to 1/21/14, the date plaintiff filed his dispositive motion, which is considered timely. Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE in writing, within 30 days of the date of this order, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to inform the court regarding consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, as required by the court's scheduling order. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to serv e on plaintiff a copy of the court's form entitled "Consent to Assignment or Request for Reassignment." Plaintiff is warned that failure to respond to this order may result in the dismissal of the action for the reasons discussed above, as well as for failure to prosecute and comply with court rules and orders. (Meuleman, A)
March 5, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/5/2014 ORDERING that the 21 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. (Zignago, K.)
May 1, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/1/2013 plaintiff's 3 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Clerk directed to serve plaintiff with Judge Kellison's Scheduling Order and to serve a copy on U.S. Marshal. Within 15 days from date of Order, plaintiff shall submit U.S. Marshal a complete Summons and copies of Complaint. Plaintiff shall also file a Statement with Court that said documents have submitted. [cc: U.S. Marshal Service] (Marciel, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Commissioner of Social Security v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D.A. Smith
Represented By: Jared Walker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]