Whitaker v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al

Defendant: - Doe and Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: Ed Whitaker
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00668
Filed: April 5, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2013 226 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/14/2013 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part defendant's 222 Motion for Partial Summary Adjudication. Court is GRANTING summary judgment for defendant on plaintiff's second cause of action and DENYING partial summary judgment on plaintiff's first cause of action. (Marciel, M)
October 23, 2013 232 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/22/13 ORDERING the parties hereby agree and stipulate that: Plaintiff may depose Alan Caito, Randy Takeshita and Terry Fuller; Defendant may continue the deposition of Plaintiff for up to two hours; There will be no further written discovery, and; The parties request a trial date between June 2014 and October 2014, if that suits the Court. (Becknal, R)
April 16, 2014 238 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/16/14 ORDERING that the motion to compel 236 is DENIED without prejudice, and the 4/30/14 hearing is VACATED. (Kastilahn, A)
June 5, 2014 245 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/4/2014 GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART 239 Motion for Extension of Time/Motion to Compel; ORDERING that discovery be completed by 6/27/2014; ORDERING that the deposition of Alan Caito be held in Des Moine s, IA by 6/27/2014; ORDERING that the deposition of Randy Takeshita be held in, or near, Manteca, CA by 6/27/2014; ORDERING the plaintiff to pay all expenses incurred by the defendant's counsel in connection with said depositions, to be paid prior to the Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2014. (Michel, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Whitaker v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Thomas J. Wybenga, PHV
Represented By: Simon Lee Yang
Represented By: Timothy M. Rusche
Represented By: David D. Kadue
Represented By: Mark Peter Grajski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Whitaker
Represented By: David S Zelenski
Represented By: D. Alan Harris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]