Landslide Communications et al v. State of California et al

Defendant: Kamala Harris, State of California, Ann Ravel and California Fair Political Practices
Plaintiff: James Lacy and Landslide Communications
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00716
Filed: April 11, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court NON-RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/24/13 ORDERING the court is in receipt of the Notice of Related Cases concerning the above-captioned cases filed 4/15/13. After consideration, the court has determined that it is i nappropriate to relate or reassign the cases, and therefore declines to do so. This order is issued for informational purposes only, and shall have no effect on the status of the cases, including any previous Related (or Non-Related) Case Order of this court. (Becknal, R)
June 17, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 6/14/13 ORDERING that the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference currently set for 7/8/13 is CONTINUED to 8/5/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. A joint status report shall be filed fourteen days prior to the hearing. All other requirements of the Court's 4/11/13 Order Setting Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference remain in effect. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 16, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/15/13 ORDERING that the deadline for plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is extended to 8/22/13; opposition and cross-motion due by 9/19/13. (Manzer, C)
December 27, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 12/27/2013 ORDERING Plaintiffs' 25 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED; and Defendants' 26 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; CASE CLOSED. (Waggoner, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Landslide Communications et al v. State of California et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Ravel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Fair Political Practices
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lacy
Represented By: Bradley William Hertz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landslide Communications
Represented By: Bradley William Hertz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]