Thomas v. United Air Lines, Inc. et al

Defendant: Rafael Padilla Cruz and United Air Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sylvia Thomas
Case Number: 2:2013cv00745
Filed: April 17, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 49:1471
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/11/13 ORDERING that the 7/17/13 hearing on defendant United Air Lines' MOTIN to DISMISS 5 is VACATED. The status (pretrial scheduling) Conference curre ntly set for 8/21/13 is VACATED. Plaintiff shall ORDER to SHOW CAUSE, in writing within fourteen days from the date of this order, why defendant Rafael Padilla Cruz, should not be dismissed for failure to effect service of process within the time pr escribed by Rule 4 (m) and/or for failure to comply with the FRCP and this court's previous orders. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Defendant United Air Lines' MOTION to DISMISS 5 be granted. Defendant United Air Lines be dismissed from this action. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections to these F&Rs due within fourteen days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 30, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/30/20103. The 7/11/2014 14 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. If plaintiff opines service on Cruz was proper and that he failed to timely respond to Complaint, within 30 days, plaintifff shall request that Clerk enter Cruz's Default. (Marciel, M)
August 20, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/16/13 ADOPTING 14 Findings and Recommendations; GRANTING 5 Motion to Dismiss. United Air Lines, Inc. DISMISSED from this action. (Meuleman, A)
December 12, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/12/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION TO STRIKE 33 is DENIED. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Defendant Cruz's Motion to Dismiss 30 be granted. Plaintiff& #039;s complaint be dismissed without leave to amend; Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment 33 be DENIED; The Clerk be directed to enter judgment in defendants' favor and The Clerk be directed to close the case. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections to these F&Rs due within fourteen days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 22, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/17/14 DENYING 47 Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment. (Manzer, C)
June 25, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/24/14 DENYING 56 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court will not entertain any further motions for reconsideration on these grounds. (Meuleman, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. United Air Lines, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Padilla Cruz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Marysia Okreglak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]