Montez v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michael Stanley Montez
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00788
Filed: April 22, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
 
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/23/13 for a First Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Opening Brief. (Meuleman, A)
November 26, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/25/13: Defendant shall have a second extension of time of 30 days to respond to Plaintiff's opening brief. The new due date for filing the Commissioner's response to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand is January 8, 2014.(Kaminski, H)
April 29, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/29/13 ORDERING that plaintiff's request to proceed IFP is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to serve on plaintiff the undersigned's scheduling order in social security cases. The Clerk is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the USM. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM a completed summons and copies of the complaint and file a statement with the court that said documents have be en submitted to the USM. The USM is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. The USM shall also send a copy of the summons and complaint by registered or certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security. (cc USM)(Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Montez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Susan L. Smith, GOVT
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stanley Montez
Represented By: Richard Allen Whitaker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]