Ferrando v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Matt A. Ferrando
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2013cv00842
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER for extension of time signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/5/13. (Kaminski, H)
March 25, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/25/2015 ORDERING 18 Plaintiff's motion for remand is DENIED; the Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
June 10, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/7/13 GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed IFP; plaintiff shall submit service dosuments to the USM within 15 days and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted; the USM is directed to serve process within 60 days. (Manzer, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferrando v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt A. Ferrando
Represented By: Robert Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.