Labou v. Cellco Partnership et al

Defendant: Los Angeles SMSA Limited Partnership and Cellco Partnership
Plaintiff: Rebecka Labou
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00844
Filed: April 30, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 23, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/18/13 GRANTING 28 Ex Parte Application. The Court ACCEPTS as filed Plaintiff's 25 Response in Opposition to Defendant's motion to deny class certification, which response in opposition is 25 pages in length. (Meuleman, A)
March 3, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/28/2014 GRANTING 20 Motion to Deny Class Certification. (Michel, G)
July 1, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/30/2014 DENYING 40 Motion to Amend the Complaint. (Michel, G)
September 15, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/12/14 DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, the putative claims are DISMISSED without prejudice, and the third party complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court further ORDERS that each party shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to CLOSE this action. CASE CLOSED. (Meuleman, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Labou v. Cellco Partnership et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles SMSA Limited Partnership
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellco Partnership
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecka Labou
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]