Collier v. Vallejo Police Department et al

Defendant: City of Vallejo, Solano Sheriff's Department, Vallejo Social Security, Sutter Hospital and Vallejo Police Department
Plaintiff: Donald T. Collier
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00852
Filed: May 1, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE to the USDC for the Eastern Distr. of Ca re 14 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/30/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/30/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/1/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 5/1/2013.]
July 16, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/15/13 ORDERING that the hearing on defendants' 29 motion to dismiss is CONTINUED to 9/4/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. Plaintiff shall fi le opposition, if any, to the motion to dismiss, no later than 8/21/2013. Failure to file opposition and appear at the hearing will be deemed as a statement of nonopposition and shall result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Kastilahn, A)
September 6, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/5/13 RECOMMENDING that the 29 amended motion to dismiss be granted; and this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)
January 13, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/10/2014 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 34 are NOT ADOPTED; and this matter is REFERRED back to the assigned magistrate judge for further proceedings consistent with this order. (Reader, L)
February 11, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/10/14 Recommending that Plaintiff's 10/7/13 MOTION 38 be denied. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to US District Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections to these Findings and Recommendation due within fourteen days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 11, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/10/14 ORDERING that Defendants' 6/10/13 AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss 29 is GRANTED; The Complaint is DISMISSED; and Plaintiff is GRANTED thirty days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint that complies with the requirements of the FRCP, the Local Rules of Practice, and this order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 24, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 42 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, in full, signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/24/2014. Plaintiff's 10/7/2013 38 Motion to Set Aside Jurisdiction is DENIED. (Marciel, M)
June 11, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/10/2014 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Collier v. Vallejo Police Department et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vallejo
Represented By: Claudia M. Quintana
Represented By: Furah Z. Faruqui
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solano Sheriff's Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vallejo Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutter Hospital
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vallejo Police Department
Represented By: Claudia M. Quintana
Represented By: Furah Z. Faruqui
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald T. Collier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]