United States of America v. Approximately $25,900.00 in U.S. Currency

Claimant: Gerard Richard
Defendant: Approximately $25,900.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00858
Filed: May 2, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
 
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/21/13 ORDERING that a Status Conference is set for 9/27/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Manzer, C)
October 28, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/25/2013 DENYING without prejudice 9 Motion for Extension of Time; DENYING without prejudice 14 Motion for Acceptance of previously submitted claim; ORDERING Claimant Richard to file and serve a proper verified claim within thirty (30) days; ORDERING Claimant Richard to file and serve an answer to the 1 Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem twenty-one (21) days thereafter; ORDERING the plaintiff to file a proposed schedule for this action fourteen (14) days thereafter; ALLOWING Claimant Richard to file a proposed schedule fourteen (14) days thereafter. (Michel, G)
January 27, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/24/2014 DENYING claimant Gerard Richard's 25 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Claimant may file a Proposed Schedule for action within 14 days of date of Order if he desires to do so. (Marciel, M)
August 13, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/12/14. The Court ADOPTS the Stipulation for Final Judgment of Forfeiture entered into by and between the parties to this action. Judgment is entered against claimant Gerard Richard and all other potential claimants who have not filed claims in this action. Upon entry of this Final Judgment of Forfeiture, $18,900.00 of the $25,900.00 in U.S. Currency, together with any interest that may have accrued on the total amoun t seized, shall be forfeited to the United States pursuant to 21 U.S.C. § 881(a)(6), to be disposed of according to law. Upon entry of this Final Judgment of Forfeiture, but no later than 60 days thereafter, $7,000.00 of the $25,900.00 in U.S. Currency shall be returned to claimant Gerard Richard. CASE CLOSED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 3, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re issuance of warrant for arrest of articles in rem signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/3/13. (Kaminski, H)
May 8, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/7/2013 GRANTING 1 Application for Publication filed by United States of America. (Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $25,900.00 in U.S. Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gerard Richard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $25,900.00 in U.S. Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]