Verma, et al. v. Okev, et al.

Defendant: Lloyd Burton, Efrat Okev and Augzenta, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zentek Corporation, Vishal Verma and Kristi Verma
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00865
Filed: May 2, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Placer
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/25/2013 EXTENDING TIME to file a Joint Status Report; ORDERING that a Joint Status Report be filed by 8/2/2013. (Michel, G)
July 29, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/26/2013 ORDERING 16 Motion Hearing on motions to dismiss, 14 , 15 Reset for 9/5/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.; Oppositions due by 8/22/2013, and replies on or before 8/29/2013. (Reader, L)
December 31, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/31/13 ORDERING that Augzenta's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction 15 is DENIED. Additionally, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 14 is DENIED as to Plaintiffs' First, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth and Tenth Causes of Action and GRANTED with leave to amend as to Plaintiffs' Second, Third, Seventh, Eighth, Ninth, Eleventh, Twelfth, Thirteenth, and Fourteenth Caus es of Action. Plaintiffs are not entitled to punitive damages as to their Fifth Cause of Action, but have otherwise adequately set forth their entitlement to recover such damages as to their other claims. Not later than thirty (30) days following the date this Memorandum and Order is electronically filed, Plaintiffs may (but are not required to) file an amended complaint. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 17, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/17/14 ORDERING that the time for Plaintiffs to file a responsive pleading shall be EXTENDED to 3/28/2014. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 18, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 3/17/14 ORDERING that all Discovery shall be completed by 8/22/2014; Designation of Expert Witnesses is due by 10/22/2014; the last day to hear dispositive motions shal l be 2/19/2015; the Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 4/30/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., with a joint final pretrial conference statement due by 4/9/2015; the parties shall file trial briefs no t later than 4/16/2015; any evidentiary or procedural motions are due by 4/9/2015, oppositions due by 4/16/2015, and any reply due by 4/23/2015; A Jury Trial is SET for 6/22/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. Engla nd, Jr.. The parties estimate a trial length of five (5) days. A Settlement Conference is SET for 6/9/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. Each party is directed to submit to the chambers of Judge Allison Claire confidential settlement conference statements not later than 6/2/2014. (Kastilahn, A)
July 31, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 7/28/14 ORDERING that the time for all parties to complete non-expert discovery is EXTENDED to 10/21/2014. (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Verma, et al. v. Okev, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Burton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Efrat Okev
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augzenta, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zentek Corporation
Represented By: Seth J. Schwartz
Represented By: Denise J. Serra
Represented By: Lee David Stimmel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vishal Verma
Represented By: Denise J. Serra
Represented By: Seth J. Schwartz
Represented By: Lee David Stimmel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi Verma
Represented By: Lee David Stimmel
Represented By: Denise J. Serra
Represented By: Seth J. Schwartz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]