Ramirez v. BNSF Railway Company, et al

Defendant: Agustin Vidrio, Burlington Northern Santa Fe, LLC and BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Graciela Ramirez
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00968
Filed: May 15, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 10/22/2013 ORDERING 15 Status Conference RESET for 11/25/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. A further status report shall be filed no later than 14 days prior to the Status Conference, in which the parties shall address how this matter should proceed without defendant Vidrio's participation. (Waggoner, D)
December 18, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS ON AGUSTIN VIDRIO signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 12/17/13.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 28, 2014 26 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 3/27/2014 ORDERING that the Scheduling Order is AMENDED as follows: Initial expert disclosures due 5/22/2014 and any contradictory and/or rebuttal expert disclosure are due by June 22, 2014; Each party will now be permitted twelve (12) total fact witness depositions. (Zignago, K.)
May 15, 2014 29 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 5/15/14 ORDERING that the Scheduling Order is AMENDED as follows; Initial Expert Disclosure due 6/6/2014, and any contradictory and/or rebuttal Expert Disclosure due on or before 7/5/2014. (Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ramirez v. BNSF Railway Company, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agustin Vidrio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burlington Northern Santa Fe, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Jason W. Schaff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graciela Ramirez
Represented By: Mary E. Alexander
Represented By: Jennifer L Fiore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]