Bunce v Ocwen

Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: James V Bunce
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00976
Filed: May 16, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Placer
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/25/2013 granting 10 plaintiff's request to appear by telephone at the 7/15/2013 motion hearing at 2:00 p.m. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
July 17, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/16/13 ORDERING that defendant's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.Plaintiff has twenty days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint if he can do so consistent with this Order. (Becknal, R)
August 29, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/28/13. The Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 9/3/2013 is hereby VACATED. The parties shall serve the initial disclosures no later than 10/4/2013. Designatio n of Expert Witnesses due by 12/13/2014 and any rebuttal and any other supplemental expert disclosures due on or before 1/24/2014. All discovery shall be completed by 3/28/2014. All motions to compel discovery may be heard not later than 3/28/2014. A ll motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders, or other emergency applications, shall be filed on or before 5/16/2014. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 7/21/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Jury Trial is SET for 9/23/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The parties estimate that a jury trial will last three days. (Kastilahn, A)
October 1, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/30/13 ORDERING that defendant's MOTION to DISMISS 25 is GRANTED; Plaintiff has twenty days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint, if plaintiff can do so consistent with the Court's previous Order of 7/17/13. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 16, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/15/13. CASE CLOSED. (Manzer, C)
June 25, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/25/13 GRANTING defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing's request to appear telephonically at the 7/15/13 hearing. (cc: IT) (Manzer, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bunce v Ocwen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: T. Robert Finlay
Represented By: Kristina M. Pelletier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James V Bunce
Represented By: Joel Mark Feinstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]