Jackson v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Debra Ann Jackson
Case Number: 2:2013cv01097
Filed: June 1, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/2/13 ORDERING thatthe Commissioner of Social Security's Motion to Stay 13 is GRANTED. CASE STAYED. The stay entered herein shall be lifted upon restoration of appropriations without further order of the court.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 6, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/6/14 ORDERING that the time for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's 20 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT is EXTENDED for 30 days until 3/7/2014. The parties further stipulate that the remaining dates in the Court's Scheduling Order shall be modified accordingly. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 10, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/9/2014 DENYING 20 Motion for Summary Judgment; 24 Motion for Summary Judgment; ENTERING JUDGMENT for the Commissioner of Social Security. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G)
June 4, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/4/2013 GRANTING 3 Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis; The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in social security cases. The Cler k of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM a completed summons and copies of the complaint and to file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the USM. The USM is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. (Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Annabelle J. Yang, GOVT
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Ann Jackson
Represented By: Richard Allen Whitaker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]