Pena et al v. Taylor Farms Pacific, Inc. et al

Defendant: Manpower, Inc., Abel Mendoza, Inc., Taylor Farms Pacific, Inc., Quality Farm Labor, Inc. and Slingshot Connections LLC
Plaintiff: Wendell T. Morris, Rosemary Dail, Leticia Suarez, Consuelo Hernandez and Maria del Carmen Pena
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv01282
Filed: June 26, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2013 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/13/13 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' 82 motion to compel is DENIED without prejudice to renewal following disposition of the pending motion for class certification. Defendant's 66 mo tion to compel is GRANTED to the extent that plaintiffs' counsel shall verify in writing within five days that no further responsive declarations exist, and shall provide written verification from plaintiffs within five days thereafter; in all other respects, the motion is DENIED. Both parties' requests for sanctions are DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
January 23, 2014 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/23/2014. All parties are directed to meet and confer as to whether merits Discovery, perhaps with limited scope, should proceed before resolution of class certification. Following their meet and confer, parties are directed to file Joint Statement apprising Court of their joint and/or respective positions. Statement shall be filed within 7 days of date of this Order. (Marciel, M)
March 28, 2014 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/27/2014 ORDERING that Defendant's 52 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. (Zignago, K.)
April 23, 2014 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/22/14 ORDERING that The MOTION to Dismiss 121 is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART; The fourth claim is dismissed entirely; The fifth claim is dismissed as to Plaintiff Wendell Morris; The sixth claim is dismissed insofar as it relies on failure to itemize payments for missed meal or rest breaks; The eighth claim is dismissed entirely; and The remaining claims may proceed. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 1, 2014 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/30/2014 ORDERING the Court STRIKES Defendant's 154 , 155 , 157 , 158 , 159 , 160 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment; if defendant wishes to be heard on 8/8/2014 as currently scheduled, it i s directed to file a consolidated compliant motion by 7/11/2014; defense counsel is further ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, concurrent with refiling, why sanctions should not be imposed in the amount of $500.00. (Reader, L) Modified on 7/1/2014 (Shaddox-Waldrop, A).
July 29, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 EX PARTE APPLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/26/13: The parties shall meet and confer pursuant to Rule 26(f) within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order. (Kaminski, H)
October 8, 2014 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/7/14 ORDERING that Defendant Manpower, Inc.'s 6/12/14 request for leave to conduct discovery is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
August 16, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/15/13: The 10/31/13 Status Conference is ADVANCED to 9/5/2013 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Joint status report due no later than 8/29/13. The deadline for plaintiffs to file their motion for class certification is extended to 10/4/13; opposition due by 11/4/13; reply due by 11/11/13. (Manzer, C)
October 15, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/14/2013 ORDERING 13 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; Defendants Motion to Strikeis DENIED; Plaintiff's UCL claim derived from violation of CLC section 203 is DISMISSED; Plaintiffs are directed to file a Seventh Amended Complaint consistent with this order within 21 days. (Waggoner, D)
October 24, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/23/13 ORDERING the court DENIES plaintiffs' request to seal. Because defendant has waived any argument that the documents should not be filed, the Clerk of the Court is directed to file on the public docket Plaintiff's Request to Seal Documents, the Declaration of Kitty Szeto in Support Thereof, and the documents attached to the Szeto declaration. (Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pena et al v. Taylor Farms Pacific, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manpower, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abel Mendoza, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Farms Pacific, Inc.
Represented By: Jesse Alvin Cripps, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah Zenewicz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Farm Labor, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slingshot Connections LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell T. Morris
Represented By: Stuart Rowe Chandler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Dail
Represented By: Stuart Rowe Chandler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia Suarez
Represented By: Stuart Rowe Chandler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consuelo Hernandez
Represented By: Stuart Rowe Chandler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria del Carmen Pena
Represented By: Stuart Rowe Chandler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]