Ellis v. Keener et al

Plaintiff: Robert Ellis
Defendant: Morris and Keener
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv01299
Filed: June 28, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/6/13 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations 9 , filed on August 21, 2013, are hereby VACATED; The Clerk of the Court is directed to file plaintiffs requests at ECF No. 11 and ECF No. 12 in the docket of Case No. 2:11-cv-2954 TLN DAD P; and the Clerk shall close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Dillon, M)
June 27, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/27/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013) [Transferred from cand on 6/28/2013.]
July 9, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/9/2013 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk shall send petitioner a new ifp application.(Yin, K)
August 21, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/20/13 ORDERING the clerk of the court make a random assignment of a district judge to this case. U.S. District Judge John A. Mendez randomly assigned to this case. Also, RECOMMENDING that that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ellis v. Keener et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ellis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keener
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]