Keonkongchack v. Advanced Call Center Technologies, LLC

Defendant: Advanced Call Center Technologies, LLC
Plaintiff: Devra Keonkongchack
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv01385
Filed: July 11, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2013 11 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER 9 signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/9/13 ORDERING this matter STAYED pending the parties' private mediation set for 11/13/2013. The stay shall be lifted on 11/27/2013, and the parties shall file an updated joint status report on or before 11/27/2013. (Kastilahn, A)
October 23, 2013 13 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/22/13 ORDERING that upon review of the Parties' Stipulated Protective Order and upon a finding of good cause, it is hereby ordered that the foregoing Protective Order is approved and the Parties are ordered to act in compliance therewith. (Becknal, R)
December 19, 2013 16 Featured Case PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/18/13: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 9/30/2015. Discovery due by 7/30/2015. Dispositive Motions filed by 1/14/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Jury Trial set for 6/13/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Kaminski, H)
June 4, 2014 18 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/2/14 GRANTING 17 Stipulation for a STAY pending final approval of the proposed class action settlement in Shelley Carl, et al v. Advanced Call Center Technologies, LLC, Superior Cou rt for the State of California, Sacramento County, Case No. 34-2013-00148310. The Parties are DIRECTED to file a joint statement notifying the Court of the status of the proposed class action settlement within 3 days of the Sacramento Superior Court's ruling on the motion for final approval. (Meuleman, A)
August 1, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER of 7 NON-RELATED CASES signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/31/2013. Court is DECLINING to relate cases pursuant to Local Rule 123. Assignment of matters to the same judge is not likely to effect a substantial savings of judicial effo rt or other economies. These actions involve the same or similar defendants, but the actions involve different proposed classes, there are unique facts and claims to each case, it is not clear that the same result should follow in these actions, and assignment to different judges would not entail substantial duplication of labor. Therefore, 2:13-cv-01472 KJM DAD shall NOT be reassigned to Judge Nunley. (Marciel, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Keonkongchack v. Advanced Call Center Technologies, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Call Center Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Michael Gerald Leggieri
Represented By: Michael E. Brewer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devra Keonkongchack
Represented By: Charles A. Jones
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]