Moore v. Sacramento County Sheriffs Dept et al

Plaintiff: Adrian Eugene Moore
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriffs Dept, Jennings, Carriger, Sacramento County Main Jail and M. Heller
Case Number: 2:2013cv01386
Filed: July 11, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/14/14 ORDERING that the Sheriff of Sacramento County or a designee shall collect from the prison trust account of Adrian Eugene Moore an initial partial filing fee and shall forward the amount to the Clerk of the Court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiffs signed in forma pauperis affidavit on the Sheriff of Sacramento County. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc Financial)(Dillon, M)
February 18, 2015 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/17/15 ORDERING that Plaintiffs proposed third amended complaint (Doc. No. 38 ) is disregarded; Plaintiffs motion for sanctions (Doc. No. 44 ) is denied; Defendants motion to compel (Doc. No. [4 7]) is granted. Within 45 days of the date of service of this order, plaintiff shall serve on defense counsel further responses to defendants special set of interrogatories and defendants requests for production; Defendants request for monetary s anctions (Doc. No. 47 ) is denied without prejudice; Plaintiffs motions for summary judgment (Doc. Nos. 34 , 35 , 39 , 42 , 43 , 45 ) are denied without prejudice to plaintiffs filing of, if appropriate, one motion for summary judgment as to all defendants; Defendants motion to stay briefing on plaintiffs motions for summary judgment (Doc. Nos. 46 ) is denied as unnecessary; Defendants motions to modify the courts discovery and scheduling order (Doc. Nos. 48 & 57 ) are granted. Withi n 60 days of the date of this order, defendants shall take plaintiffs deposition, if any. Within 120 days of this order, the parties shall file any motion for summary judgment they wish to pursue. Except as provided in this order, the courts discovery and scheduling order remains in effect; and Plaintiffs motion for default (Doc. No. 55 ) is denied.(Dillon, M)
April 2, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/02/15 ordering ( Settlement Conference set for 6/3/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman.) The parties are directed to exchange non-confidential settleme nt statements 7 days prior to the settlement conference. These statements shall simultaneously be delivered to the court using the following email address: kjnorders@caed.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff may mail his non-confidential settlement statement to arrive not less than 7 days prior to the settlement conference, addressed to Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman, USDC CAED, 501 I Street, Suite 4-200, Sacramento, CA, 95814. (cc: KJN). (Plummer, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Sacramento County Sheriffs Dept et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Eugene Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriffs Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Main Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]