Ray v. Advanced Call Center Technologies, LLC

Defendant: Advanced Call Center Technologies, LLC
Plaintiff: Quianna Ray
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv01472
Filed: July 22, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER of 10 NON-RELATED CASES signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/31/2013. Court is DECLINING to relate cases pursuant to Local Rule 123. Assignment of matters to the same judge is not likely to effect a substantial savings of judicial eff ort or other economies. These actions involve the same or similar defendants, but the actions involve different proposed classes, there are unique facts and claims to each case, it is not clear that the same result should follow in these actions, and assignment to different judges would not entail substantial duplication of labor. Therefore, this action shall NOT be reassigned to Judge Nunley. (Marciel, M)
October 16, 2013 21 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/15/2013 ORDERING 20 that the foregoing Protective Order is APPROVED and the parties are ORDERED to act in compliance therewith. (Reader, L)
April 30, 2014 32 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/29/14 ORDERING, good cause appearing, the parties' stipulation for a stay pending final approval of the proposed class action settlement in Shelley Carl, et al. v. Advanced Call Cent er Technologies, LLC, Superior Court for the State of California, Sacramento County, Case No. 34-2013-00148310, is GRANTED. The Parties are directed to file a joint statement notifying the Court of the status of the proposed class action settlement within three days of the Sacramento Superior Court's ruling on the motion for final approval. (Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ray v. Advanced Call Center Technologies, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Call Center Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Michael Gerald Leggieri
Represented By: Michael E. Brewer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quianna Ray
Represented By: Daniel Franklin Gaines
Represented By: Alex Paul Katofsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]