Pugh v. Bank of America,et al

Defendant: National Default Servicing Corporation, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Bank of America, N.A. and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Plaintiff: Jesse N. Pugh
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv01635
Filed: August 7, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2013 10 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/9/2013 ORDERING that the deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED to 9/20/2013. (Zignago, K.)
September 27, 2013 14 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/26/13: The deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to October 2, 2013. (Kaminski, H)
October 22, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/21/13 CONTINUING HEARING as to 12 Motion to Dismiss and 13 Motion to Expunge to 11/14/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Plaintiff's time to respond is extended to 10/24/13. (Manzer, C)
October 31, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/30/13: Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal 20 is GRANTED. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 12 is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. This Court retains jurisdiction to decide Defendants' Motion to Expunge Recorded Notice of Pendency of Action 13 . Hearing on that Motion is hereby continued to December 5, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 7. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pugh v. Bank of America,et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Default Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Woods
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Woods
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Woods
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Sharon Stewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Woods
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse N. Pugh
Represented By: Charles T. Marshall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]