Gutierrez et al v. Bank of America N.A. et al

Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., Bank of America N.A. and US Bank National Association As Trustee For The Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust
Plaintiff: Isaac Gutierrez and Purificacion M. Infante
Case Number: 2:2013cv01695
Filed: August 15, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2410 Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/28/13 GRANTING request for extension of time. Joint Status Report due by 11/29/13. (Manzer, C)
December 4, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/3/13 GRANTING request to extend time to file Joint Status Report to 1/17/14. (Manzer, C)
April 8, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/4/14 GRANTING 8 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint within 30 days of the entry of this order. Failure to do so will result in this case being closed. (Meuleman, A)
May 6, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/6/2014 GRANTING 23 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
August 22, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/21/14 ORDERING that the Action denominated 2:14-cv-1246 MCE CKD, is REASSIGNED to U.S. District Judge Troy L. Nunley and U.S. Magistrate Judge Allison Claire for all further proceedings. Any dates cu rrently set in the reassigned case are VACATED. The Caption on documents filed in this Reassigned case shall be shown as: 2:14-cv- 01246-TLN-AC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment and issue an Order Requiring a Joint Status Report for the undersigned.(Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez et al v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.
Represented By: Jason Matthew Richardson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Jason Matthew Richardson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association As Trustee For The Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust
Represented By: Jason Matthew Richardson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Gutierrez
Represented By: Charles T. Marshall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Purificacion M. Infante
Represented By: Charles T. Marshall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]