Demers v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Paul Demers, Jr
Case Number: 2:2013cv02096
Filed: October 10, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/31/2014 ORDERING that plaintiff's time to file a motion for summary judgment is EXTENDED to 4/28/2014. (Zignago, K.)
April 25, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/25/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff's time to file a MOTION for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to the new filing date of 5/28/2014, and all other due dates are EXTENDED accordingly.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 29, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/29/14. The deadline for Plaintiff to file motion for summary judgment is extended to 6/16/14. (Manzer, C)
January 21, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/21/15 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment 19 is DENIED; The Commissioner's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 20 is GRANTED; Judgment is entered for the Commissioner. The Clerk shall close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 18, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/18/13: The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in Social Security cases. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal. (cc:USM) (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demers v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Demers, Jr
Represented By: Peter Brixie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.