RedFox Industries Inc. v. Carpenters 46 Northern California, et al

Plaintiff: RedFox Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Carpenters 46 Northern California Counties Conference Board and Carpenters Local Union 46
Case Number: 2:2013cv02176
Filed: October 18, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29:184
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 10, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/8/2014 ORDERING the parties to provide supplemental briefing as to whether Plaintiff's claims are ripe. Such briefing shall be no more than ten (10) pages in length and shall be filed with the Court on or before 4/25/2014. (Zignago, K.)
May 19, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/16/14 DENYING 6 Motion to Dismiss. (Manzer, C)
February 25, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/24/2015 CONTINUING the Settlement Conference to 3/9/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Michel, G.)
March 24, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT 32 and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/23/2015. Upon compliance with Agreement, the grievances are resolved with no admission of liability. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorney fees. Parties request Court to VACATE all docket and calendar entries pending compliance with Settlement Agreement. In the event the case is not dismissed by 6/30/2015, parties request Court to order parties to file a Joint Status Report as to the status of compliance with this Agreement on that date. (Marciel, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RedFox Industries Inc. v. Carpenters 46 Northern California, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RedFox Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Robert Day
Represented By: Chad Steven Tapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carpenters 46 Northern California Counties Conference Board
Represented By: Ezekiel Daystar Carder
Represented By: Matthew J. Gauger
Represented By: Blythe Mickelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carpenters Local Union 46
Represented By: Ezekiel Daystar Carder
Represented By: Matthew J. Gauger
Represented By: Blythe Mickelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]