Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company v. Chiang

Plaintiff: Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company
Defendant: John Chiang
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv02317
Filed: November 6, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/26/13. Defendant shall have until 1/15/14 to file a responsive pleading to the complaint. (Manzer, C)
December 20, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/19/2013 ORDERING that Defendant shall have an EXTENSION to and including 3/14/2014 to file a pleading or motion in response to the Complaint. (Zignago, K.)
January 3, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/3/2014 ORDERING 19 the parties shall have until 3/28/2014 to submit their joint status report. (Reader, L)
February 25, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER 21 signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/24/14 ORDERING the Controller to respond to the Complaint on or before 4/30/2014. The parties shall have until 5/16/2014 to submit a joint status report. (Kastilahn, A)
June 26, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENTS signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/26/14. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 4, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/1/2014 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 32 Motion to Disqualify Defendant's Counsel is DENIED and Defendant's 36 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, on ripeness grounds. (Zignago, K.)
August 21, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/20/14 ORDERING that the action denominated 2:14-CV-01837 MCE-KJN be reassigned to Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Carolyn K. Delaney for all further proceedings, and any dates currently s et in this reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned cases shall be shown as 2:14-CV-01837 JAM-CKD. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company v. Chiang
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Sasseville, PHV
Represented By: Daniel J. Schwartz, PHV
Represented By: Chad Weaver
Represented By: Bryan A. Welp, PHV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Chiang
Represented By: Ronald Vincent Placet
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]