United States of America v. Approximately $16,280.00 in U.S. Currency

Defendant: Approximately $16,280.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2013mc00021
Filed: March 15, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 3/15/13 extending time for filing a complaint or to obtain indictment to June 18, 2013.(Kaminski, H)
June 17, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 6/14/13 EXTENDING time for filing a complaint for forfeiture and/or to obtain an indictment alleging forfeiture. (Meuleman, A)
September 4, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 9/4/13. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $16,280.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $16,280.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.