AmericanWest Bank v. Matthews et al

Defendant: Jeanne A. Hulit, Farm Service Agency, Debra G. Matthews, Owen Nathan Matthews and Macy's Flying Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: AmericanWest Bank
 
Case Number: 2:2014cv00304
Filed: January 30, 2014
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Modoc
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Referring Judge: Craig M. Kellison
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/14/2014 ORDERING that pursuant to 25(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Maria Contreras-Sweet, who has been confirmed as the Administrator of the U.S. Small Business Administration, is substituted in lieu of Jeanne A. Hulit as a defendant in this suit. The Clerk of the Court shall update the docket accordingly. (Zignago, K.)
April 17, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/17/14 ORDERING that the Initial status conference in this matter is reset to June 2, 2014 at 2:00 p.m; All parties shall comply with all provisions of the court's January 30, 2014 Order Setting Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference 5 in connection therewith; Plaintiff and the federal defendants shall file updated status reports. Plaintiff shall include in its status report any relevant updates concerning the appearance or non-appearance of MFS and Borrowers. (Becknal, R)
May 28, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/27/14 ORDERING that the dispositional documents disposing of the case be filed no later than 30 days from the effective date of this order. All hearing dates heretofore set in this matter are hereby VACATED. (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: AmericanWest Bank v. Matthews et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne A. Hulit
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Service Agency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra G. Matthews
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owen Nathan Matthews
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's Flying Service, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AmericanWest Bank
Represented By: Robert Joseph Wood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]