Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company v. Chiang

Defendant: John Chiang
Plaintiff: Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2014cv01837
Filed: August 4, 2014
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/20/14 ORDERING that the action denominated 2:14-CV-01837 MCE-KJN be reassigned to Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Carolyn K. Delaney for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set i n this reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned cases shall be shown as 2:14-CV-01837 JAM-CKD. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Becknal, R)
November 13, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/12/2014 ORDERING 20 the Court GRANTS in PART, and DENIES in PART, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, and DENIES Plaintiff's 9 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff's first, third, fourth, and fifth causes of action are DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. The action will proceed consistent with this Order. (Reader, L)
December 5, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS (Pre-trial Scheduling) ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/5/14: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 5/6/2016. Discovery due by 7/1/2016. Dispositive Motions filed by 9/21/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. Jury Trial set for 1/23/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Kaminski, H)
March 2, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/27/2015 STAYING this case pending the final resolution of the pending life insurance cases, including the exhaustion of any and all appeals, for a period of no less than two years; ORDERING the parties to submit on 3/1/2017, and every six months thereafter, a joint case management statement to update the Court regarding the procedural status of the pending life insurance cases and any and all applicable appeals. (Michel, G.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company v. Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Chiang
Represented By: Julie Ann Belezzuoli
Represented By: Steven S. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelity & Guaranty Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Knowles
Represented By: Bryan A. Welp, PHV(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.