Center For Biological Diversity et al v. Federal Highway Administration et al

Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, California Department of Transportation, Malcolm Dougherty and Federal Highway Administration
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity, Sierra Club, Willits Environmental Center and Environmental Protection Information Center
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv02172
Filed: May 1, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2012 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE REQUEST FOR MANUAL FILING OF ELECTRONIC COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/13/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
February 1, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 115 Stipulation RE: Motion to Supplement Administrative Records and Memorandum in Support. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/1/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
February 6, 2013 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 117 Stipulation re 107 Motion to Supplement Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 6, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
February 8, 2013 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESOLVING MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/8/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
April 8, 2013 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUING HEARING: Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/8/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
April 15, 2013 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 133 STIPULATION of Dismissal of California Farm Bureau Federation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/15/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
June 3, 2013 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF EXCERPTS OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD CITED IN MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/3/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
June 20, 2013 145 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/20/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
December 19, 2013 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE denying 132 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 135 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 137 Motion for Summary Judgment (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
June 26, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS MOOT: 13 MOTION to Dismiss IN LIGHT OF AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/26/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
July 11, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 25 STIPULATION Extending FHWA's Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/11/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
August 23, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING DATE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by California Department of Transportation, Malcolm Dougherty. Case Management Statement due by 10/5/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/12/2012 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 23, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
September 4, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 STIPULATION extending time for Caltrans' responsive pleading.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/4/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
September 10, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING: 55 Motion to Shorten Time on 48 Motion for for Preliminary Injunction and continuing Case Management Conference. Motion Hearing on 48 Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 10/12/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, Sa n Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 10, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 11, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 39 Motion to Dismiss and DENYING 23 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 11, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
October 3, 2012 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION. Responses due by 10/5/2012.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/3/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
October 9, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 78 STIPULATION DISMISSING FHWA. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/9/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
October 9, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Defendants' Objections to Statement of Non-Opposition. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 9, 2012. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
October 11, 2012 82 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 11, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
November 1, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 48 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Center For Biological Diversity et al v. Federal Highway Administration et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Martha Collins Mann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Transportation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm Dougherty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Highway Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity
Represented By: Doug Ruley
Represented By: Aruna Prabhala
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: Sharon Eileen Duggan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Sharon Eileen Duggan
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: Aruna Prabhala
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willits Environmental Center
Represented By: Sharon Eileen Duggan
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: Aruna Prabhala
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Protection Information Center
Represented By: Sharon Eileen Duggan
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: Aruna Prabhala
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]