Pace et al v. Bonham et al

Defendant: Stafford Lehr, California Department of Fish and Game and Charlton H. Bonham
Plaintiff: Felice Pace and Wilderness Watch
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv05610
Filed: November 1, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
 
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/8/13 is continued to 5/10/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/28/13., Motions terminated: 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER continuing Case Management Conference filed by Stafford Lehr, Charlton H. Bonham. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
March 6, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 3/8/13, 3/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/6/13., Motions terminated: 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 20 MOTION to Dismiss to Change Hearing Date filed by Felice Pace. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
March 15, 2013 33 Featured Case ORDER OF REFERRAL. Environmental Protection Information Center v. Ayers, 13-656 MMC, is referred, pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12(c), to the Honorable Susan Illston for consideration of whether the case is related to Pace v. Bonham, 12-5610 SI. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 15, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
April 30, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DISMISSING AS MOOT MOTION TO DISMISS ORIGINAL COMPLAINT 37 20 26 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
May 6, 2013 44 Featured Case ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/10/13 is continued to 6/28/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/2/13., Motions terminated: 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 21 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Set Hearings, to Re-Schedule Case Management Conference filed by Felice Pace.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
June 12, 2013 51 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE 48 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
September 30, 2013 61 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 45 MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge William H. Orrick. The Court GRANTS defendants' motion to strike and strikes the following portions of the Second Amended Complaint: (1) and by canisters borne by packstock (page 2, line 6); (2) p aragraph 11 (page 4, lines 9 to 13); (3) or packstock (page 4, line 15); (4) paragraph 16 (page 5, lines 11 and 12); (5) and discrete conveyances carried by packstock, and by other confined and discrete conveyances (page 5, lines 24 and 25) and (6), packstock, or other means that constitute a point source of pollution (page 6, lines 2-3). (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
October 29, 2013 66 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER (AS MODIFIED) RESOLVING PENDING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re 64 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Plaintiff's 63 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration is GRANTED. The C ourt VACATES its September 30, 2013, Order Granting Motion to Strike. If any party wishes to be heard regarding the Court's modification of the Stipulation, it should advise Ms. Jean Davis, Courtroom Deputy, on or before the close of business on Friday, November 1, 2013. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/29/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
November 4, 2013 68 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. The Court GRANTS defendants' Motion to Dismiss and DISMISSES this case WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/04/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pace et al v. Bonham et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stafford Lehr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Fish and Game
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlton H. Bonham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felice Pace
Represented By: Julia Olsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilderness Watch
Represented By: Julia Olsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]