Harrison et al v. Robinson Rancheria Band of Pomo Indians Business Council

Plaintiff: Alan Harrison, Inez Sands, Christina Harrison, Karen Ramos, Robert Quitiquit, Reuben Want and Joseph Lewis Kitto
Defendant: Robinson Rancheria Band of Pomo Indians Business Council
Case Number: 1:2013cv01413
Filed: March 29, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Referring Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT VACATE ITS PREVIOUS ORDER GRANTING LEAVE FOR ATTORNEY KITTO TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE Show Cause Response due by 9/6/2013. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 30, 2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
September 3, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 26 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Robinson Rancheria Band of Pomo Indians Business Council. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 3, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
September 11, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REVOKING PRO HAC VICE STATUS OF ATTORNEY JOSEPH KITTO re 28 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 11, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 12, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 24 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Robinson Rancheria Band of Pomo Indians Business Council. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 12, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 30, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 24 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
October 23, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY COMPLAINT SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO RULE 41(B). Show Cause Response due by 11/7/2013. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/14/2013 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 22, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
November 5, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS re 32 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Robinson Rancheria Band of Pomo Indians Business Council. The Order to Show Cause, ECF No. 38, remains on calendar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 5, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 14, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Judge Jon S. Tigar, denying 32 Motion for Sanctions. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 14, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO RULE 41(B) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 14, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison et al v. Robinson Rancheria Band of Pomo Indians Business Council
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Harrison
Represented By: Joseph Lewis Kitto
Represented By: Jeffrey Daly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inez Sands
Represented By: Jeffrey Daly
Represented By: Joseph Lewis Kitto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Harrison
Represented By: Joseph Lewis Kitto
Represented By: Jeffrey Daly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Ramos
Represented By: Jeffrey Daly
Represented By: Joseph Lewis Kitto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Quitiquit
Represented By: Joseph Lewis Kitto
Represented By: Jeffrey Daly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reuben Want
Represented By: Jeffrey Daly
Represented By: Joseph Lewis Kitto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lewis Kitto
Represented By: Joseph Lewis Kitto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson Rancheria Band of Pomo Indians Business Council
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]