Chetco Federal Credit Union v. Dobbs et al

Defendant: Cappy Dobbs, Judith Ann Dobbs and Cone Rock, Inc.
Plaintiff: Chetco Federal Credit Union
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01571
Filed: April 8, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Referring Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2013 30 Featured Case Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 23 Motion to Substitute Party. Chetco Federal Credit Union and Chetco Federal Credit Union terminated.(sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
April 30, 2014 37 Featured Case ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 5/30/2014. Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 04/30/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
June 2, 2014 39 Featured Case ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 06/02/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Chetco Federal Credit Union v. Dobbs et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cappy Dobbs
Represented By: David C. Lee
Represented By: Dohn R. Henion
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Ann Dobbs
Represented By: Dohn R. Henion
Represented By: David C. Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cone Rock, Inc.
Represented By: Dohn R. Henion
Represented By: David C. Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chetco Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Leora R. Ragones
Represented By: Timothy James McCaffery
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]