Infostream Group, Inc. et al v. Paypal, Inc.

Plaintiff: Infostream Group, Inc., WhatsYourPrice.com and Lead Wey
Defendant: Paypal, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00748
Filed: February 15, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
April 2, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND WITHDRAWING MOTION TO DISMISS Motions terminated: 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Paypal, Inc., 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO AMEND COMPLAINT filed by Infostream Group, Inc., Lead Wey, WhatsYourPrice.com. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/30/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012) Modified on 4/2/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting leave to extend time to respond to first amended complaint.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/19/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
July 25, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing motions and case management from 7/27/12 to 8/31/12, Motions terminated: 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 29 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Paypal, Inc... Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/24/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
August 28, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 29 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
November 13, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/13/12. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
January 25, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting stipulation to extend time for mediation to 2/28/13. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/24/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
October 30, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT. Show Cause Response due by 11/6/2013. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 30, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Infostream Group, Inc. et al v. Paypal, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Infostream Group, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Lee Smith
Represented By: Christian Anthony Anstett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WhatsYourPrice.com
Represented By: Christian Anthony Anstett
Represented By: Mark Lee Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lead Wey
Represented By: Christian Anthony Anstett
Represented By: Mark Lee Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paypal, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Snyder
Represented By: Vivian Injung Kim
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]