Orchard Supply Hardware LLC v. Home Depot USA, Inc. et al

Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc., Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation and Makita USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Orchard Supply Hardware LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv06361
Filed: December 14, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
 
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2013 19 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 18 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
January 14, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS by Judge Alsup denying 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; denying 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; denying 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
February 10, 2013 31 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS FOR ATTORNEYS HANSEN, BRENNER, AND NAEGER by Judge Alsup granting 25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting 26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting 27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2013)
March 14, 2013 37 Featured Case ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/30/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 14, 2013. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
April 9, 2013 41 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 9, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
April 12, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 30 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
August 13, 2013 57 Featured Case ORDER ADVISING PARTIES OF COURT'S TENTATIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 13, 2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - not to be published or cited for any purpose)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
September 19, 2013 59 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
October 16, 2013 62 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Answer filed by Home Depot USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 16, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
March 5, 2014 78 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING ADR MEET-AND-CONFER. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 5, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 18, 2014 80 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Re: NOTICE OF PRIVATE MEDIATION AND REQUEST FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING MEDIATION) filed by Orchard Supply Hardware LLC. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 18, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Orchard Supply Hardware LLC v. Home Depot USA, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Dale Lanphere
Represented By: Lindsay A. Lutz
Represented By: Roxane Alicia Polidora
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation
Represented By: Laura A Brenner
Represented By: Scott W. Hansen
Represented By: Jennifer Naeger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Makita USA, Inc.
Represented By: Richard James Mooney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orchard Supply Hardware LLC
Represented By: Dorn Graham Bishop
Represented By: William A. Markham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]