Allen, et al v. City of Oakland, et al

 
Case Number: 3:2000cv04599
Filed: December 7, 2000
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Referring Judge: James Larson
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2014 1015 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Internal Affairs investigations and subsequent proceedings. The Compliance Director shall investigate the matters raised in this order and direct Defendants to take appropriate corrective action. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/14/14. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 20, 2014 1017 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving Compliance Director staff (Edward Swanson). Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/20/14. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
September 10, 2014 1021 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 996 Frank Morrow Jr.'s Motion to Intervene. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tmi, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2005 260 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER designating case for electronic case filing and order administratively re-opening case. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/14/05. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2005)
October 21, 2008 478 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Section V.C.1 (Task 26) and V.G.1 (Task 30) of the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/20/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
November 26, 2008 482 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Section III.D.1 (Task 4) of the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/25/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
September 3, 2009 509 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER following September 3, 2009 status conference. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/03/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
November 24, 2009 519 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re: attorneys fees during NSA extension. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/24/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
November 24, 2009 520 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving the Memorandum of Understanding re: Post NSA Terms and Conditions. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/24/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
January 27, 2010 526 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing monitor. Robert S. Warshaw is appointed as Monitor pursuant to the terms of 520 Order approving the Memorandum of Understanding re: Post NSA Terms and Conditions. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/27/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
March 16, 2010 531 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/4/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/15/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
May 27, 2010 542 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: technical assistance. The parties and the Monitor shall meet and confer and reach a financial agreement on technical assistance on or before 06/04/10. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/27/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
August 31, 2010 553 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring identification of persons responsible for certain tasks. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/31/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
September 15, 2010 557 Opinion or Order of the Court *** PLEASE SEE DOCKET #558 FOR CORRECTED VERSION *** ORDER re: persons responsible for certain tasks. Individuals designated as persons responsible shall file weekly reports with the Monitor, beginning on 09/27/10. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/16/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (tehlc3, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 558 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: persons responsible for certain tasks. Individuals designated as persons responsible shall file weekly reports with the Monitor, beginning on 09/27/10. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/15/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
October 15, 2010 569 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (153 in 3:08-cv-04914-TEH, 153 in 3:08-cv-04914-TEH) Order, Set Hearings. Settlement Conference set for 3/15/2011 10:00 AM.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 10/15/10. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 15, 2010 570 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re (154 in 3:08-cv-04914-TEH, 154 in 3:08-cv-04914-TEH) Order, Set Hearings Settlement Conference set for 3/15/2011 10:00 AM.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 10/15/10. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
November 5, 2010 575 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: weekly reports. Plaintiffs' counsel shall have access to weekly reports subject to a proposed protective order to be filed by the parties on or before 11/15/10. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/05/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 16, 2010 577 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER re: City of Oakland Police Dept's weekly reports. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/15/10. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 24, 2010 580 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: contents and delivery of weekly reports. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/24/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
December 8, 2010 585 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating December 9, 2010 case management conference. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/08/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
December 9, 2010 586 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 584 Defendants' request for in camera hearing. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
December 15, 2010 587 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/15/2010 Withdrawing Attorney Terence J. Cassidy as co-counsel for Defendant City of Oakland in cases C-08-4914-TEH & C-08-4984-TEH re 579 . (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
March 22, 2011 595 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER modifying reporting frequency. Defendants shall submit reports every other week, rather than weekly. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/22/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
March 22, 2011 596 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting status conference and reporting deadlines. Status Conference set for 06/16/11 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Joint status conference statement due by 06/09/11. Confidential joint written reports re: extension of monitoring due by 04/04/11 and every two weeks thereafter. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/22/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
April 4, 2011 601 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Date for Submission of Joint Letter re MOU Negotiations. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/04/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 13, 2011 602 Opinion or Order of the Court Scheduling ORDER re: extension of court monitoring. The parties have until 05/13/11 to file a stipulated agreement and proposed order. If full agreement is not reached, Plaintiffs shall file a motion on or before 06/20/11, scheduled for hearing on 08/29/11 at 10:00 AM. The requirement that the parties file confidential joint written reports concerning settlement shall be discontinued. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/13/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 603 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: accountability. Defendants may file amendments or additions to designations of persons responsible for particular tasks on or before 05/02/11. Defendants shall submit by 05/02/11 a description of the line of authority above the Chief of P olice. The parties and Intervenor OPOA shall have until 05/16/11 to file documents regarding whether the Court's prior orders form a sufficient legal basis to enter sanctions, including contempt, against individual employees. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/13/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 21, 2011 604 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: April 18, 2011 Letter from PUEBLO. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/21/11. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - April 18, 2011 Letter from PUEBLO)(tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
May 12, 2011 608 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending 05/13/11 deadline. Parties have until 06/24/11 to file stipulation and proposed order re: extension of court monitoring but must provide a status update in their joint statement due on 06/09/11. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/12/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 18, 2011 611 Opinion or Order of the Court Second ORDER re: accountability. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/18/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 25, 2011 614 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Time of Status Conference to 6/16/2011 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/25/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
June 15, 2011 617 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating June 16, 2011 status conference. June 24, 2011 deadline to reach final settlement on extension of court monitoring remains in effect. Parties to meet and confer with the Monitor on date for next status conference. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/15/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
September 8, 2011 630 Opinion or Order of the Court Second ORDER re: September 22, 2011 status conference. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/08/11. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted version of August 25, 2011 order [docket no. 626])(tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 12, 2011 631 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: ex parte communications. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/12/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
October 3, 2011 641 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting status conference. Status Conference set for 1/26/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Joint status conference statement due by 1/19/2012. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/03/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
November 23, 2011 651 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 646 Motion to Relate Cases. This case is not related to Case No. C11-5498 RS. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
December 2, 2011 654 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Amending Briefing Schedule for 643 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Against City of Oakland Police Officer, J Hargraves and/or City of Oakland Police Lieutenant, C. Wong. Responses due by 12/12/2011. Replies due by 12/19/2011. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/01/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
December 22, 2011 667 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 659 Plaintiffs' motion to file December 14, 2011 letter under seal. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
January 24, 2012 675 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating January 26, 2012 status conference and conferring additional authority on the Monitor. Parties' stipulation concerning schedule for receivership proceedings due on or before 02/27/12. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/24/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 27, 2012 676 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson re: 643 Plaintiffs' motion for sanctions against Officer Hargraves and Lieutenant Wong. Any future requests for sanctions shall follow the procedure set forth in this order. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
February 24, 2012 686 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Re Briefing and Hearing Dates for Receivership Proceedings re 684 : Motions due by 10/4/2012. Responses due by 11/8/2012. Replies due by 11/29/2012. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/23/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
May 1, 2012 691 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring plan re: Occupy Oakland Internal Affairs investigations. Defendants shall submit written plan to Monitor by 05/07/12. Plan shall be approved by Monitor and implemented by 05/14/12. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/01/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
May 31, 2012 692 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: officer-involved shootings and Occupy Oakland investigations. Defendants shall file plan re: Occupy Oakland investigations by 06/08/12. Monitor shall include discussion of officer-involved shootings and the Frazier report in his next quarterly report. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/31/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
June 7, 2012 693 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Frazier report. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/07/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
June 7, 2012 694 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER clarifying 675 January 24, 2012 order re: the Monitor's authority. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/07/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
June 18, 2012 697 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: persons responsible for Occupy Oakland investigations. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/18/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
August 7, 2012 708 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 701 Intervenor's motion for clarification. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/07/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 21, 2012 711 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting re 710 Motion to Withdraw re 709 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. The City to file declarations by 08/27/2012 explaining error. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/21/2012. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 27, 2012 713 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: limited nature of intervention by Oakland Police Officers' Association. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/27/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
September 7, 2012 725 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 722 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Mayor Jean Quan filed by Delphine Allen. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 9/7/2012. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 10, 2012 726 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendant City of Oakland's Motion for Equitable Relief. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 9/10/12. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2012: # 1 FILED UNDER SEAL-ORDER) (tn, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2012 727 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: outside contracts. Response by Defendant City of Oakland due by 09/21/12. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/11/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
September 13, 2012 730 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 719 Plaintiffs' motion for expanded page limits. Plaintiffs' opening brief in support of motion for receivership shall not exceed fifty pages.(tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
September 26, 2012 738 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying Intervenor OPOA's re 731 Motion for further intervention, and re 733 Motion to shorten time. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
September 28, 2012 740 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying protective order for deposition of Mayor Quan. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 9/28/2012. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
October 2, 2012 743 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Monitor's report on officer-involved shootings. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/02/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
October 4, 2012 748 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 747 Administrative Motion for Relief from General Order No. 62. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/04/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
October 11, 2012 830 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of referral re: 751 Plaintiffs' motion to file under seal. The motion is referred to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/11/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
October 18, 2012 838 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Defendants' electronic mail system. Defendants' response due by 10/26/12. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/18/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
October 22, 2012 840 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson re: 839 October 19, 2012 stipulation between Plaintiffs and Intervenor Oakland Police Officers' Association.(tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
November 6, 2012 844 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 843 Defendants' October 26, 2012 response to Court order. Defendants shall work with Monitor regarding email messages sorted as junk mail. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/06/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
November 6, 2012 845 Opinion or Order of the Court ***FILED IN ERROR*** Please see Docket No. 846 . Modified on 11/6/2012 (tehlc3, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2012 846 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 841 Defendant's administrative motion re: discovery and oral testimony. Joint statement re: proposed witnesses due by 11/19/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
November 14, 2012 861 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to meet and confer re: 752 Plaintiffs' motion to appoint receiver. Joint statement due by 11/29/12. Deadline to submit witness list extended to 11/29/12. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/14/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 27, 2012 874 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 867 Plaintiffs' motion to expand page limits on their reply memorandum in support of motion to appoint receiver. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 27, 2012 875 Opinion or Order of the Court ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER EXTENDING CERTAIN DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 11/27/2012. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 28, 2012 876 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting 751 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 30, 2012 879 Opinion or Order of the Court ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 11/30/2012. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2012) Modified on 11/30/2012 (nclc1S, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2012 890 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for the Filing of the Parties' Proposed Candidates for Compliance Director. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/20/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
March 1, 2013 909 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to file salary information. The City Attorney shall file requested salary information by 03/04/13 at 12:00 noon. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/01/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
March 4, 2013 911 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Compliance Director. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/04/13. (Attachment: # 1 Resume of Thomas C. Frazier) (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
March 25, 2013 918 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of clarification. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/25/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
April 3, 2013 923 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending Compliance Director's deadlines and continuing status conference. Joint status conference statement due by 7/15/2013. Status conference set for 7/25/2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/03/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
April 10, 2013 924 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of clarification re: scope of Compliance Director's authority. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/10/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
April 17, 2013 926 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving Compliance Director staff. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/17/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
April 29, 2013 928 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving payment for March 2013 (Cashdollar). Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/29/13. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Invoice) (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
May 2, 2013 931 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving payment for March and April 2013 (Anders). Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/02/13. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - March Invoice, # 2 Exhibit - April Invoice) (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 13, 2013 932 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving payment for April 2013 (Cashdollar). Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/13/13. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Invoice) (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 23, 2013 935 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving payment for March and April 2013 (Yank). Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/23/13. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - March Invoice, # 2 Exhibit - April Invoice) (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
June 25, 2013 939 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving payment for Compliance Director staff (May 2013). Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/25/13. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Anders Invoice, # 2 Exhibit - Cashdollar Invoice, # 3 Exhibit - Yank Invoice) (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 27, 2013 940 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: subject matter experts. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/27/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
July 22, 2013 947 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving payment for Compliance Director staff (June 2013). Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/22/13. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Anders Invoice, # 2 Exhibit - Cashdollar Invoice, # 3 - Exhibit Yank Invoice) (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
July 23, 2013 948 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating status conference. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/23/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
August 2, 2013 950 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving payment for subject matter expert (Mathis, June and July 2013). Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/02/13. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Invoice Summary) (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
August 22, 2013 951 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving payment for Compliance Director staff (July 2013). Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/22/13. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Anders Invoice, # 2 Exhibit - Cashdollar Invoice, # 3 Exhibit - Yank Invoice) (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 26, 2013 952 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Compliance Director's compensation. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/26/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
September 27, 2013 955 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving payment for Compliance Director staff (August 2013). Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/27/13. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Anders invoice, # 2 Exhibit - Cashdollar invoice, # 3 Exhibit - Yank invoice) (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
October 7, 2013 959 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving payment for subject matter expert (Wren, May 2013). Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/07/13. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Invoice) (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
October 11, 2013 960 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving payment for subject matter expert (Mathis, July to October 2013). Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/11/13. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Invoice Summary) (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 22, 2013 961 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving payment for Compliance Director staff (September 2013). Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/22/13. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Anders invoice, # 2 Exhibit - Cashdollar invoice, # 3 Exhibit - Yank invoice)(tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
November 25, 2013 964 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving payment for Compliance Director staff (October 2013). Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/25/13. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Anders invoice, # 2 Exhibit - Cashdollar invoice, # 3 Exhibit - Yank invoice) (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
January 14, 2014 968 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving payment for Compliance Director staff (November 2013). Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/14/14. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Anders invoice, # 2 Exhibit - Cashdollar invoice, # 3 Exhibit - Yank invoice). (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 22, 2014 970 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving payment for Compliance Director staff (December 2013). Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/22/14. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Anders invoice, # 2 Exhibit - Cashdollar invoice, # 3 Exhibit - Yank invoice)(tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 27, 2014 971 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving payment for subject matter expert (Alpert, December 2013). Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/27/14. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Invoice) (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 28, 2014 972 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 971 ORDER approving payment for subject matter expert (Alpert, December 2013). Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 1/27/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Invoice)(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
February 12, 2014 973 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER modifying compliance oversight model. Appointment of Compliance Director will terminate on 03/10/14. All authority previously vested in the Compliance Director is transferred to the Monitor, effective immediately. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/12/14. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 25, 2014 974 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving payment for Compliance Director staff (January 2014) and terminating requirement to deposit funds. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/25/14. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Anders invoice, # 2 Exhibit - Cashdollar invoice, # 3 Exhibit - Yank invoice) (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
March 13, 2014 975 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving payment for Compliance Director staff (February 2014) and returning funds to Defendant City of Oakland. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/13/14. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Anders invoice, # 2 Exhibit - Cashdollar invoice, # 3 Exhibit - Yank invoice) (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
May 29, 2014 981 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring updated lists of persons responsible. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/29/14. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
July 22, 2014 986 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: consultation requirements. The Compliance Director shall discuss the City's obligations with the Chief of Police, City Administrator, and Mayor to ensure that they understand this Court's orders. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/22/14. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Allen, et al v. City of Oakland, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]