Cunzhu et al v. Yahoo Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs Cunzhu Zheng and Guo Quan allege that Defendants Yahoo! Inc. and Yahoo! Hong Kong, Ltd. provided Chinese officials with access to plaintiffs\' email account, thereby exposing Plaintiffs to persecution and torture by the Chinese government because Plaintiffs have advocated for democracy and multi-party government in China.

Plaintiff: Zheng Cunzhu and Guo Quan
Defendant: Yahoo Inc. and Yahoo! Hong Kong, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2008cv01068
Filed: February 22, 2008
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2008 1
COMPLAINT /no process against Yahoo Inc., Yahoo! Hong Kong, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 44611001859.). Filed byZheng Cunzhu, Guo Quan. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
September 15, 2008 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING YAHOO! INC.'S MOTION TO CHANGE TIME AND TEMPORARILY TO STAY PENDING DEADLINES; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from September 26, 2008 to November 21, 2008. A Joint Case Manageme nt Statement, or, if appropriate, separate statements, shall be filed no later than November 14, 2008. The Court stays all other current deadlines; in particular, the deadline for any defendant to file a response to the complaint, the deadline for th e parties to make initial disclosures, and the deadline to complete mediation are stayed; new deadlines will be set at the Case Management Conference. The September 22, 2008 ADR conference call is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 15, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
January 14, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATED REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT JANUARY 16, 2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 14, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
February 26, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO CHANGE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND; SETTING DEADLINE TO COMPLETE MEDIATION. Plaintiffs shall be permitted to file their Second Amended Complaint on February 27, 200 9. Defendants shall respond by May 1, 2009. In the event defendants file a motion to dismiss, the hearing will be conducted on June 26, 2009. Further, the deadline to complete mediation is October 2, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 26, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
March 12, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 12, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
April 28, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CHANGE TIME FOR FILING, BRIEFING, AND HEARING YAHOO!, INC.'S AND YHKL'S JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss on or before May 22, 2009. Plaintiffs shall file any opposition on or before June 26, 2009. Defendants shall file any reply on or before July 3, 2009. The hearing is continued to July 17, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 28, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
May 11, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF REGARDING THE LENGTH AND FORM OF YAHOO!, INC.'S AND YHKL'S JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendants Yahoo!, Inc. and Yahoo!, Hong Kong, Ltd. are permitted 50 pages of briefing for their memorandums in support of their Motion to Dismiss and such briefing may be dispersed through two separate memorandums. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 11, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
May 19, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY CASE AND HOLD ALL DEADLINES IN ABEYANCE UNTIL AFTER JULY 24, 2009 STATUS CONFERENCE. The Court will set a time for defendants to respond to the Second Amended Complaint and for the parties to complete mediation at or after the July 24, 2009 conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 19, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
July 17, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT JULY 24, 2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 17, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
August 3, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. By orders filed July 29, 2009, the Chief Judge of this District ordered Manshardt removed from the roll of attorneys authorized to practice before this Court. In light of said orders, the Clerk is hereby directed to remove Manshardt from the docket. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 3, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
October 21, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION; CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Plaintiffs' oppositions, filed October 19, 2009, are deemed timely filed and the deadline for defendants to file their reply briefs is extended to November 2, 2009. The hearing on defendants' motions to dismiss is continued to December 4, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 21, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
October 22, 2009 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE DEADLINE TO COMPLETE MEDIATION. The deadline to complete mediation is continued to February 12, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 22, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
December 2, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER RULE 12(B)(6); VACATING HEARING. Plaintiffs' claims against the Yahoo! Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 2, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
December 2, 2009 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER RULES 12(B)(1) AND 12(B)(7); VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 2, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
December 2, 2009 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CLAIMS AGAINST PEOPLES REPUBLIC OF CHINA SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND TO SERVE. Plaintiffs are ordered to show cause, in writing and no later than December 23, 2009, why plaintiffs' claims against the PRC should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and failure to effectuate timely service. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 2, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
December 28, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO SERVE PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA. The deadline to serve the People's Republic of China is extended to January 20, 2010. If, by January 27, 2010, plaintiffs have not filed a proof of service on the PRC, the Court will dismiss plaintiffs' claims against the PRC, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 28, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
February 1, 2010 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE CLAIMS AGAINST PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Plaintiffs' claims against the PRC are dismissed without prejudice. Further, because the Court, by order filed December 2, 2009, dismissed plaintiffs' claims against all other defendants, the Clerk is directed to enter judgment against plaintiffs and to close the file. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 1, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
February 1, 2010 99 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT: The plaintiffs claims against the Yahoo! Defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice and plaintiffs claims against Peoples Republic of China are DISMISSED without prejudice. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunzhu et al v. Yahoo Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zheng Cunzhu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guo Quan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo! Hong Kong, Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]