Labrador v. Seattle Mortgage Company

Plaintiff: Mary B. Labrador
Defendant: Seattle Mortgage Company
Case Number: 3:2008cv02270
Filed: May 1, 2008
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Selective Service Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2010 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 98 Motion for Settlement (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
January 13, 2011 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 119 Ex Parte Application (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 19, 2011 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 117 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval filed by Mary B. Labrador (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
April 13, 2011 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/29/2011 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 4/22/2011.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/13/2011. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 129 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Seattle Mortgage Company (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 25, 2011 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING 130 Order to Show Cause Hearing (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
August 31, 2011 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 135 Brief, filed by Mary B. Labrador (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
April 5, 2012 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 137 Approving Final Distribution of Cy Pres Award. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/5/2012. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
October 29, 2008 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 5 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Seattle Mortgage Company. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/28/08. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
August 13, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re Modification of Status Conference Order: Hearing on class certification is scheduled for 2/5/10 at 10:00 a.m; Case Management Conference currently scheduled for January 22, 2010 is continued to March 5, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/13/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
September 21, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend is now set to be heard on December 18, 2009 at 10:00 a.m., Hearing on Class Certification is set to be heard on June 11, 2010 at 10:00 a.m., The Case Management Conference is continued to 7/9/2010 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/21/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
January 15, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 48 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 51 Motion for Leave to File (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
February 24, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re Modification of Status Conference Order. Hearing on Class Certification set for 6/11/10 is continued to 9/19/10 at 10:00 a.m. Status Conference set for 7/9/10 is continued to 11/19/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/23/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
April 30, 2010 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The parties stipulation to have a Magistrate Judge appointed to serve as Discovery Referee is DENIED (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
July 27, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court Substitution of Attorney and Order: Defendant Seattle Mortgage Company substitutes Jeffer, Mangeles, Butler & Marmaro LLP in place of Severson & Werson. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 7/26/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
September 1, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 83 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and ordering Plaintiff to resubmit 76 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
September 7, 2010 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 89 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (sclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 13, 2010 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 88 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (sclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 22, 2010 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 75 Motion to Certify Class (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Labrador v. Seattle Mortgage Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary B. Labrador
Represented By: Mark Andrew Chavez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Mortgage Company
Represented By: John B. Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]