Apple Inc. v. Psystar Corporation Featured Case

Plaintiff Apple Inc. alleged that Defendant Psystar Corporation sold in commerce a computer named the OpenMac--subsequently changed to Open Computer--which runs a modified version of the Leopard operating system without authorization from Plaintiff and in violation of the terms of the Software License Agreement governing the use of Mac OS X software and Plaintiff's intellectual property., Defendant also provided direct copies and/or modified versions of Plaintiff's software updates.

 
Case Number: 3:2008cv03251
Filed: July 3, 2008
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: James Larson
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2010 256 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 248 Notice of Appeal. USCA No. 10-15113. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
March 12, 2010 255 Certificate of Record forwarded to USCA (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
February 23, 2010 254 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/20/09, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2010. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 16, 2010 253 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Psystar Corporation for proceedings held on all dates before Judge Alsup.. (Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 16, 2010 252 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 9, 2009, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2010. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
January 29, 2010 251 USCA Case Number 10-15113 Ninth Circuit for 248 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Psystar Corporation. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 25, 2010 250 STATUS REPORT Supplement by Psystar Corporation. (Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 15, 2010 249 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 248 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Docket Sheet)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 14, 2010 248 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 243 Judgment, 242 Order, 207 Order on Motion to Seal, 208 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 209 Order on Motion to Seal Document, 210 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 211 Order on Motion to Seal, 212 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 213 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 214 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 150 Order by Psystar Corporation. Filing fee $ 455; Receipt No. 34611041135 (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010) Modified on 2/2/2010 (sis, COURT STAFF). Case No. 10-15113
December 31, 2009 247 STATUS REPORT Regarding Compliance with Injunction by Psystar Corporation. (Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 12/31/2009)
December 31, 2009 246 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/12/09, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/31/2010. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 12/31/2009)
December 16, 2009 244 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 14, 2009, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2010. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 15, 2009 243 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 15, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 15, 2009 242 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION re 231 filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 15, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 14, 2009 245 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 12/14/2009). Motion for Permanent Injunction, Statutory Damages and Reasonsable Attorneys' Fees and Costs - Taken Under Submission. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/14/2009)
December 8, 2009 241 Featured Case ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL, CASE MANAGEMENT, AND STATUS CONFERENCES. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 8, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2009)
December 7, 2009 240 Reply Memorandum IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION filed byApple Inc.. (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 1, 2009 239 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITION OF CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 1, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
December 1, 2009 238 STIPULATION REGARDING DISPOSITION OF CLAIMS by Apple Inc.. (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
November 30, 2009 237 Memorandum in Opposition 231 to Apple's Motion for a Permanent Injunction filed by Psystar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 11/30/2009) Modified on 12/1/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2009 236 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2009 02:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2009 02:00 PM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
November 23, 2009 235 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of 231 MOTION for Permanent Injunction Statutory Damages and Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Philip Schiller, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gilliland, James) (Filed on 11/23/2009) Modified on 11/24/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2009 234 AFFIDAVIT re 231 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) DECLARATION OF CAROL A. SCOTT IN SUPPORT OF APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Apple Inc.. (Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 23, 2009 233 AFFIDAVIT re 231 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) DECLARATION OF MATTHEW R. LYNDE IN SUPPORT OF APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A TO DECLARATION OF MATTHEW R. LYNDE IN SUPPORT OF APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION)(Gilliland, James) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 23, 2009 232 AFFIDAVIT re 231 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) DECLARATION OF JOHN P.J. KELLY IN SUPPORT OF APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Apple Inc.. (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 23, 2009 231 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by Apple Inc. OF MOTION IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION, STATUTORY DAMAGES AND REASONABLE ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF MEGAN M. CHUNG IN SUPPORT OF APPLE INC.S MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBITS 1-6 TO DECLARATION OF MEGAN M. CHUNG IN SUPPORT OF APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION)(Gilliland, James) (Filed on 11/23/2009) Modified on 11/24/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2009 230 *** FILED IN ERROR BY COURT STAFF. PLEASE DISREGARD. *** (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009) Modified on 11/24/2009 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2009 214 Featured Case ORDER RE CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup (re 181 Motion for Summary Judgment and 182 Motion for Summary Judgment). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 13, 2009 213 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF PSYSTAR'S REPLY BRIEF by Judge Alsup (re 201 Motion to Seal). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 13, 2009 212 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO SEAL PSYSTAR'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE ACTION by Judge Alsup (re 203 Motion to Seal). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 13, 2009 211 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF APPLE'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup (re 199 Motion to Seal). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 13, 2009 210 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO FILE UNDER SEAL PSYSTAR'S RESPONSE TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup (re 193 Motion to Seal). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 13, 2009 209 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO SEAL PORTIONS OF APPLE'S OPPOSITION TO PSYSTAR'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup (re 190 Motion to Seal Document). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 13, 2009 208 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO SEAL PSYSTAR'S OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION TO SEAL by Judge Alsup (re 186 Motion to Seal). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 13, 2009 207 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO SEAL PORTIONS OF APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup (re 178 Motion to Seal). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 12, 2009 215 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/12/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/12/2009). Cross Motions for Summary Judgment submitted. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/12/2009)
November 9, 2009 206 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PSYSTAR'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE ACTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 9, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
November 6, 2009 227 FILED UNDER SEAL- Declaration of J. Jeb B. Oblak 203 Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 5, 2009 205 Declaration of Jeb B. Oblak in Support of 203 MOTION Motion to Seal Motion for Administrative Action [DECLARATION OF J. JEB B. OBLAK IN SUPPORT OF PSYSTAR CORPORATION'S MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING THE FILING UNDER SEAL OF PORTIONS OF PSYSTAR CORP.'S REPLY BRIEF AND EXHIBITS A-C (DKT. NO. 203)] filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 203 ) (Oblak, Jeb) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
October 30, 2009 226 FILED UNDER SEAL- REPLY Brief in support of 181 Motion for Summary Judgment filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 30, 2009 225 FILED UNDER SEAL- MOTION for an Order for Administrative Action filed by Psystar Corporation. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 30, 2009 204 Reply Memorandum re 182 MOTION for Summary Judgment Corrected Version filed byPsystar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 30, 2009 203 MOTION Motion to Seal Motion for Administrative Action filed by Psystar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 29, 2009 228 FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of J. Jeb B. Oblak in Support of 193 Motion to Seal filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 29, 2009 202 *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION . DOCUMENT REMOVED BY ORDER OF COURT. PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT 206 *** Reply Memorandum re 182 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byPsystar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 10/29/2009) Modified on 10/30/2009 (wv, COURT STAFF). (Main Document 202 replaced on 11/10/2009) (feriab, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2009 201 MOTION Motion to Seal filed by Psystar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 29, 2009 200 Reply to Opposition re 181 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, DMCA VIOLATIONS AND PSYSTAR'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment filed byApple Inc.. (Chung, Megan) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 29, 2009 199 MOTION to Seal Misc. Administrative Request to File Under Seal Portions of Apple Inc's Reply In Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Chung, Megan) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 28, 2009 198 Declaration of J. Jeb B. Oblak in Support of 193 MOTION Motion to Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 193 ) (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 23, 2009 224 EXHIBIT 7 re 192 Declaration in Opposition, filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 192 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 23, 2009 223 FILED UNDER SEAL- EXHIBIT 2 re 192 Declaration in Opposition, filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 192 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 23, 2009 222 FILED UNDER SEAL-DECLARATION of John PJ Kelly in Opposition to 182 Motion for Summary Judgment filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 23, 2009 221 FILED UNDER SEAL MEMORANDUM in Opposition 182 Motion for Summary Judgment filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 23, 2009 197 Proposed Order re 196 Memorandum in Opposition [[PROPOSED] ORDER DENYING PSYSTAR CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT] by Apple Inc.. (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 23, 2009 196 Memorandum in Opposition re 182 MOTION for Summary Judgment [APPLE INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PSYSTAR CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT] filed byApple Inc.. (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 22, 2009 229 FILED UNDER SEAL- Response to 181 Motion for Summary Judgment filed byPsystar Corporation. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 22, 2009 195 Memorandum in Opposition re 181 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, DMCA VIOLATIONS AND PSYSTAR'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed byPsystar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 22, 2009 194 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 192 Declaration in Opposition, [Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Mehrnaz Boroumand Smith] (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 22, 2009 193 MOTION Motion to Seal filed by Psystar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 22, 2009 192 DECLARATION of MEHRNAZ BOROUMAND SMITH in Opposition to 182 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Declaration of Mehrnaz Boroumand Smith in Opposition to Psystar's Motion for Summary Judgment] filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (s) 1-6, # 2 Exhibit (s) 7-14)(Related document(s) 182 ) (Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 22, 2009 191 DECLARATION of JOHN P. J. KELLY in Opposition to 182 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Declaration of John P. J. Kelly in Opposition to Psystar Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment] filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 182 ) (Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 22, 2009 190 MOTION to Seal Document [Miscellaneous Administrative Request to File under Seal Portions of Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Psystar Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment, Paragraph 2 of the Kelly Declaration and Portions of Exhibit 2 to the Boroumand Smith Declaration in Opposition to Same] filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of J. Jeb B. Oblak, # 2 Proposed Order)(Oblak, Jeb) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 22, 2009 189 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2009 02:00 PM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 14, 2009 188 Reply to Opposition re 178 MOTION to Seal Portions of Apple Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment, Portions of Lynde Declaration, Kelly Declaration and Certain Exhibits to Chung Declaration filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Reply Declaration of J. Jeb B. Oblak in Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Seal Portions of its Motion for Summary Judgment on Copyright Infringment, DMCA Violations and Psystar's Affirmative Defenses, # 2 Exhibit A-E)(Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
October 13, 2009 220 FILED UNDER SEAL Memorandum in Opposition 178 Motion to Seal filed byPsystar Corporation. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
October 13, 2009 187 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Apple's Motion to Seal filed byPsystar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Proposed Order)(Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
October 13, 2009 186 MOTION Motion to Seal Motion in Opposition filed by Psystar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
October 9, 2009 219 FILED UNDER SEALEXHIBITS 3-16,23,41,62-64 & 69 re 183 Declaration in Support,, filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 183 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 9, 2009 218 FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of Dr. John P.J. Kelly in Support of 216 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 216 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 9, 2009 217 FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of Matthew R. Lynde in Support of 216 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 216 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 9, 2009 216 FILED UNDER SEAL MOTION for Summary Judgment on Copyright Infringement filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 9, 2009 184 Declaration of Kent Radford in Support of 182 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byPsystar Corporation. (Related document(s) 182 ) (Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 8, 2009 183 Declaration of Megan C. Chung in Support of 180 Notice (Other) [DECLARATION OF MEGAN M. CHUNG IN SUPPORT OF APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, DMCA VIOLATIONS AND PSYSTARS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES] filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (s) 1-2, # 2 Exhibit (s) 3-16 (under seal), # 3 Exhibit (s) 17-22, # 4 Exhibit 23 (under seal), # 5 Exhibit (s) 24-36, # 6 Exhibit (s) 37-40, # 7 Exhibit 41 (under seal), # 8 Exhibit (s) 42-49, # 9 Exhibit (s) 50-61, # 10 Exhibit (s) 62-64 (under seal), # 11 Exhibit (s) 65-68, # 12 Exhibit 69 (under seal))(Related document(s) 180 ) (Chung, Megan) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
October 8, 2009 182 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Psystar Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2009 01:00 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Proposed Order)(Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
October 8, 2009 181 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, DMCA VIOLATIONS AND PSYSTAR'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Confidential Kelly Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Lynde Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order)(Gilliland, James) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
October 8, 2009 180 NOTICE by Apple Inc. NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, DMCA VIOLATIONS AND PSYSTAR'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
October 8, 2009 179 MOTION Motion to Seal Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Psystar Corporation. (Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
October 8, 2009 178 MOTION to Seal Portions of Apple Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment, Portions of Lynde Declaration, Kelly Declaration and Certain Exhibits to Chung Declaration filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit J. Jeb B. Oblak, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gilliland, James) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
October 8, 2009 177 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-24-2009, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CSR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2010. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
October 7, 2009 176 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held, case did not settle. (Date Filed: 10/7/2009). (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/7/2009)
October 7, 2009 175 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY KENT RADFORD PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup (re 172 Motion for Pro Hac Vice). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
October 6, 2009 ***Attorney George A. Riley for Apple Inc.,George A. Riley for Apple Inc.,George A. Riley for Apple Inc. added. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
October 6, 2009 174 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of DOE Defendants Without Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) by Apple Inc. (Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
October 6, 2009 173 NOTICE by Apple Inc. NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL (Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
October 6, 2009 171 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF DAVID WELKER REQUESTING PERMISSION TO WITHDRAW FROM THE CASE by Judge Alsup (re 170 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney). Attorney David Vernon Welker is terminated. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
October 5, 2009 172 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Kent Radford, Esq., ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611037420.) filed by Psystar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
October 1, 2009 170 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Psystar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Welker, David) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
September 28, 2009 168 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR ORDER PERMITTING THE FILING UNDER SEAL OF LETTER BRIEF DATED AUGUST 31, 2009 (re 111 Letter Brief Motion to Seal). Signed by Judge Alsup on September 28, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
September 25, 2009 158 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO FILE UNDER SEAL (1) PORTIONS OF APPLE'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS OR ENJOIN, (2) CERTAIN EXHIBITS TO THE REPLY DECLARATION OF OBLAK; (3) REPLY DECLARATION OF DR. KELLY AND EXHIBITS by Judge Alsup (re 145 Motion to Seal). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 25, 2009 157 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PSYSTAR'S OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR ENJOIN by Judge Alsup (re 140 Motion to File Under Seal). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 24, 2009 185 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing re Plt's Motion to Reopen Discovery; Motion to Dismiss held on 9/24/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 9/24/2009). Court increased the summary judgment briefing. Opening is 30 pages; opposition 30 pages; and reply 15 pages. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/24/2009)
September 24, 2009 156 Proposed Order re 140 MOTION File Document Under Seal by Psystar Corporation. (Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 24, 2009 155 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING THE FILING UNDER SEAL OF PORTIONS OF APPLE'S OPPOSITION TO PSYSTAR'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF VIDRINE AND FOR SANCTIONS by Judge Alsup (re 143 Motion to Seal). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 24, 2009 154 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PSYSTAR'S MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARATION OF VIDRINE AND PORTIONS OF APPLE'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Alsup (re 139 Motion Seal). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 24, 2009 153 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING FILING UNDER SEAL OF MOTION TO DISMISS OR ENJOIN, THE DECLARATION OF JACQUES VIDRINE AND EXHIBITS 4-11 AND 14 TO DECLARATION OF MEHRNAZ BOROUMAND SMITH by Judge Alsup (re 134 Motion to Seal). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 24, 2009 152 Featured Case ORDER DENYING APPLE'S MOTION TO ENJOIN FLORIDA ACTION AND TO RE-OPEN INSTANT CASE TO INCLUDE FLORIDA ACTION AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge William Alsup [denying 138 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 23, 2009 151 NOTICE of Appearance by Kiwi Alejandro Danao Camara Adding Eugene Action (Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 23, 2009 150 Featured Case ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND PLAINTIFF'S CROSS-MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 22, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 22, 2009 167 FILED UNDER SEAL- Declaration of Dr. John P.J. Kelly I/S/O 138 Motion to Dismiss or Enjoin filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
September 22, 2009 166 FILED UNDER SEAL- EXHIBITS 1-6 to 147 Declaration of J. Jeb B. Oblak filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
September 22, 2009 165 FILED UNDER SEAL Reply Memorandum I/S/O 138 Motion to Dismiss or Enjoin filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
September 22, 2009 163 FILED UNDER SEAL- Memorandum in Opposition 162 Motion to Strike filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
September 21, 2009 149 Declaration of Susan D. Carroll in Support of 138 MOTION to Dismiss OR ENJOIN PROSECUTION OF THE RECENTLY-FILED FLORIDA ACTION AND TO RE-OPEN DISCOVERY FOR LIMITED PURPOSES [REPLY DECLARATION OF SUSAN D. CARROLL IN SUPPORT OF APPLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR ENJOIN] filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (s) 1-4)(Related document(s) 138 ) (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 21, 2009 148 Declaration of Dr. John P. J. Kelly in Support of 138 MOTION to Dismiss OR ENJOIN PROSECUTION OF THE RECENTLY-FILED FLORIDA ACTION AND TO RE-OPEN DISCOVERY FOR LIMITED PURPOSES [REPLY DECLARATION OF DR. JOHN P. J. KELLY IN SUPPORT OF APPLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR ENJOIN, SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL] filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (s) 1-2 [submitted under seal])(Related document(s) 138 ) (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 21, 2009 147 Declaration of J. Jeb B. Oblak in Support of 138 MOTION to Dismiss OR ENJOIN PROSECUTION OF THE RECENTLY-FILED FLORIDA ACTION AND TO RE-OPEN DISCOVERY FOR LIMITED PURPOSES [REPLY DECLARATION OF J. JEB B. OBLAK IN SUPPORT OF APPLE INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS OR ENJOIN] filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (s) 1-6 [submitted under seal])(Related document(s) 138 ) (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 9/21/2009) Modified on 9/22/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2009 146 Reply Memorandum re 138 MOTION to Dismiss OR ENJOIN PROSECUTION OF THE RECENTLY-FILED FLORIDA ACTION AND TO RE-OPEN DISCOVERY FOR LIMITED PURPOSES filed byApple Inc.. (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 21, 2009 145 MOTION to Seal [MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE UNDER SEAL (1) PORTIONS OF APPLE INC.'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS OR ENJOIN, (2) CERTAIN EXHIBITS TO THE REPLY DECLARATION OF J. JEB B. OBLAK IN SUPPORT THEROF; (3) REPLY DECLARATION OF DR. JOHN P. J. KELLY AND EXHIBITS THERETO IN SUPPORT THEREOF] filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mehrnaz Boroumand Smith in Support Thereof, # 2 Proposed Order)(Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 21, 2009 144 Memorandum in Opposition re 143 MOTION to Seal PORTIONS OF APPLE INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PSYSTAR CORPORATION'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF JACQUES VIDRINE AND FOR SANCTIONS, 139 MOTION File Document Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF JAMES G. GILLILAND, JR., # 2 Exhibit 1 TO DECLARATION OF JAMES G. GILLILAND, JR., # 3 Exhibit 2 TO DECLARATION OF JAMES G. GILLILAND, JR., # 4 Proposed Order)(Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 21, 2009 143 MOTION to Seal PORTIONS OF APPLE INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PSYSTAR CORPORATION'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF JACQUES VIDRINE AND FOR SANCTIONS filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit J. Jeb B. Oblak, # 2 Proposed Order)(Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 19, 2009 142 EXHIBITS re 141 Memorandum in Opposition, (Corrected Copies) filed byPsystar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Additional Exhibit, # 2 Additional Exhibit)(Related document(s) 141 ) (Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 9/19/2009)
September 18, 2009 164 FILED UNDER SEAL- Memorandum in Opposition 138 Motion to Dismiss or Enjoin filed byPsystar Corporation. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
September 18, 2009 162 FILED UNDER SEAL- NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Declaration of Jacques Vidrine filed by Psystar Corporation. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
September 18, 2009 141 Memorandum in Opposition re 138 MOTION to Dismiss OR ENJOIN PROSECUTION OF THE RECENTLY-FILED FLORIDA ACTION AND TO RE-OPEN DISCOVERY FOR LIMITED PURPOSES filed byPsystar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
September 18, 2009 140 MOTION File Document Under Seal filed by Psystar Corporation. (Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
September 18, 2009 139 MOTION File Document Under Seal filed by Psystar Corporation. (Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
September 14, 2009 161 FILED UNDER SEAL - EXHIBITS 4-11 & 14 to 135 Declaration filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 14, 2009 160 FILED UNDER SEAL- Declaration of Jacques Vidrine in Support of 138 Motion to Dismiss or Enjoin filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 14, 2009 159 FILED UNDER SEAL- MEMORANDUM in Support 138 Motion to Dismiss or Enjoin filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 11, 2009 138 MOTION to Dismiss OR ENJOIN PROSECUTION OF THE RECENTLY-FILED FLORIDA ACTION AND TO RE-OPEN DISCOVERY FOR LIMITED PURPOSES filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Notice of Motion)(Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 11, 2009 137 Declaration of JACQUES VIDRINE in Support of 136 Proposed Order, 135 Declaration in Support,, filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 136 , 135 ) (Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 11, 2009 136 Proposed Order re 135 Declaration in Support,, by Apple Inc.. (Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 11, 2009 135 Declaration of MEHRNAZ BOROUMAND SMITH IN SUPPORT OF APPLE'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR ENJOIN PROSECUTION OF THE RECENTLY-FILED FLORIDA ACTION AND TO RE-OPEN DISCOVERY FOR LIMITED PURPOSES filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 11, 2009 134 MOTION to Seal MOTION TO DISMISS OR ENJOIN, THE DECLARATION OF JACQUES VIDRINE AND EXHIBITS 4-11 AND 14 TO DECLARATION OF MEHRNAZ BOROUMAND SMITH filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 10, 2009 133 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 4, 2009, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/7/2009. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 9, 2009 132 FILED UNDER SEAL- EXHIBITS 1,2,3 to re 125 Declaration of Megan M. Chung, filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 125 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
September 9, 2009 130 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL PSYSTAR CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE ACTION by Judge Alsup (re 105 Motion to Seal). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
September 9, 2009 129 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF APPLE INC.'S OPPOSITION LETTER BRIEF AND EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF MEGAN M. CHUNG by Judge Alsup (re 126 Motion to Seal). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
September 4, 2009 131 FILED UNDER SEAL Memorandum in Opposition 107 Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009).
September 4, 2009 128 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/4/2009 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 9/4/2009). Discovery Hearing set for 9/24/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan.) (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/4/2009)
September 3, 2009 126 MOTION to Seal Portions of Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Psystar's Brief filed on August 31, 2009 and Exhibits 1-3 to Declaration of Megan M. Chung filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Chung, Megan) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
September 3, 2009 125 Memorandum in Opposition to Psystar's Letter Brief filed August 31, 2009 112 filed by Apple Inc. REDACTED VERSION. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Chung, Megan) (Filed on 9/3/2009) Modified on 9/4/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2009 124 Reply Memorandum 127 APPLE INC.'S REPLY TO PSYSTAR CORPORATION'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON THE RELEVANCE OF TOPIC 3 TESTIMONY, DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL, AND PLAINTIFF'S CROSS-MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gilliland, James) (Filed on 9/3/2009) Modified on 9/4/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2009 123 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER RE DEFENDANTS LETTER OF 8/31/2009 RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE: STATUS CONFERENCE NOW SET FOR 10:00 A.M., SEPTEMBER 4, 2009. HEARING RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE FOLLOWS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/3/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
September 3, 2009 122 *** INCORRECT FILING - SEE DOC. #124*** Reply Memorandum to Psystar Corporation's Supplemental Briefing on the Relevance of Topic 3 Testimony, Defendant's Motion to Compel and Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for a Protective Order filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gilliland, James) (Filed on 9/3/2009) Modified on 9/4/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2009 121 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING APPLE TO FILE REPLY TO PSYSTAR'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Judge Alsup [re 118 Motion for Leave to File]. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
September 2, 2009 119 Memorandum in Opposition re 118 MOTION for Leave to File APPLE INC.'S REPLY TO PSYSTAR CORPORATION'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON THE RELEVANCE OF TOPIC 3 TESTIMONY, DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND PLAINTIFF'S CROSS-MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER filed byPsystar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Blog Post)(Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
September 2, 2009 118 MOTION for Leave to File APPLE INC.'S REPLY TO PSYSTAR CORPORATION'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON THE RELEVANCE OF TOPIC 3 TESTIMONY, DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND PLAINTIFF'S CROSS-MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Miscellaneous Administrative Request, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Request, # 3 Affidavit Decl. of Mehrnaz Boroumand Smith In Support of Miscellaneous Administrative Request, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of Mehrnaz Boroumand Smith In Support of Administrative Request, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of Mehrnaz Boroumand Smith In Support of Administrative Request, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Decl. of Mehrnaz Boroumand Smith In Support of Administrative Request, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Decl. of Mehrnaz Boroumand Smith In Support of Administrative Request, # 8 Exhibit 5 to Decl. of Mehrnaz Boroumand Smith In Support of Administrative Request)(Gilliland, James) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
September 2, 2009 116 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING FILING UNDER SEAL OF EXHIBIT B TO DECLARATION OF TYLER GEE by Judge Alsup [re 101 Motion to Seal Document]. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
September 1, 2009 169 FILED UNDER SEAL- Letter Brief dated August 31, 2009 filed byPsystar Corporation. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
September 1, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/4/2009 11:00 AM. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
September 1, 2009 115 Featured Case ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S LETTER OF 8/31/2009 RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 112 Letter Brief filed by Psystar Corporation]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/1/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
September 1, 2009 114 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE for Friday, 9/4/2009 at 11:00 AM [re 108 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Apple Inc.]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/1/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
September 1, 2009 113 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR ORDER PERMITTING THE FILING UNDER SEAL OF LETTER BRIEF DATED AUGUST 18, 2009 by Judge Alsup (re 92 Motion). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
August 31, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/4/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 112 Letter Brief Letter Brief Dated August 31, 2009 - REDACTED VERSION- filed byPsystar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 8/31/2009) Modified on 9/1/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2009 111 Letter Brief Motion to Seal filed byPsystar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 110 Featured Case ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE ON FRIDAY, 9/4/2009 AT 10:00 A.M. [re 108 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Apple Inc.]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/31/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 109 AFFIDAVIT 108 of Mehrnaz Boroumand Smith In Support of Notice of Pendency of Other Action by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of Mehrnaz Boroumand Smith, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of Mehrnaz Boroumand Smith)(Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 8/31/2009) Modified on 9/1/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2009 108 NOTICE by Apple Inc. OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Mehrnaz Boroumand Smith In Support of Notice of Pendency of Other Action, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Mehrnaz Boroumand Smith In Support of Notice of Pendency of Other Action, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Mehrnaz Boroumand Smith in Support of Motion of Pendency of Other Action)(Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 107 Letter Brief Court Ordered Supplemental Briefing filed byPsystar Corporation. (Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 106 Proposed Order to Seal 105 Motion for Administrative Action filed by Psystar Corporation. (Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 8/31/2009) Modified on 9/1/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2009 105 MOTION Motion to Seal Motion for Administrative Action filed by Psystar Corporation. (Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 104 Declaration in Support of 105 filed by Psystar Corporation. (Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 8/31/2009) Modified on 9/1/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2009 127 FILED UNDER SEAL Supplemental Briefing on the Relevance of Topic 3 Testimony, filed byPsystar Corporation. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
August 28, 2009 120 FILED UNDER SEAL-EXHIBIT B re 84 Declaration in Support, filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 84 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
August 28, 2009 103 *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION . DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER.. *** Brief re 93 Letter Brief filed byPsystar Corporation. (Related document(s) 93 ) (Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 8/28/2009) Modified on 8/28/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2009 102 Brief re 91 Letter Brief on Motion to Compel filed byPsystar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 91 ) (Camara, Kiwi) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
August 27, 2009 101 MOTION to Seal Document 100 Memorandum in Opposition,, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Decl. of Tyler Gee ISO Administrative Motion, # 2 Proposed Order)(Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 27, 2009 100 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 91 Letter Brief Supplemental Brief Opposing Psystar's Motion to Compel and In Support of Apple's Cross Motion for Protective Order filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Decl. of Tyler Gee ISO Supplemental Brief Opposing Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit Ex. A to Decl. of Tyler Gee, # 3 Exhibit Ex. B to Decl. of Tyler Gee, # 4 Exhibit Ex. C to Decl. of Tyler Gee, # 5 Exhibit Ex. D to Decl. of Tyler Gee, # 6 Exhibit Ex. E to Decl. of Tyler Gee)(Related document(s) 91 ) (Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 25, 2009 98 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING THE FILING UNDER SEAL OF OPPOSITION LETTER BRIEF DATED AUGUST 19, 2009 by Judge Alsup (re 95 Motion to Seal Document). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 24, 2009 96 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 8/20/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 8/24/2009). Supplemental briefs due by 8/27/09. Deft shall pay pltf $5,000 in attys fees. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/24/2009)
August 20, 2009 99 FILED UNDER SEAL Opposition Letter Brief dated 08/19/09 filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 20, 2009 95 MOTION to Seal Document 94 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Chung, Megan) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 20, 2009 94 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 91 Letter Brief filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-5)(Related document(s) 91 ) (Chung, Megan) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 19, 2009 117 FILED UNDER SEAL Letter Brief dated 08/18/09 filed byPsystar Corporation. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 19, 2009 97 Proposed Order re 92 First MOTION PERMITTING THE FILING UNDER SEAL OF CONFIDENTIAL PORTIONS OF LETER BRIEF by Psystar Corporation. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 19, 2009 93 Letter Brief filed byPsystar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Welker, David) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 18, 2009 92 First MOTION PERMITTING THE FILING UNDER SEAL OF CONFIDENTIAL PORTIONS OF LETER BRIEF filed by Psystar Corporation. (Welker, David) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 18, 2009 91 Letter Brief filed byPsystar Corporation. (Welker, David) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 14, 2009 90 Letter Brief re 85 Letter Brief,, Letter Brief (Redacted Public Version) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Exs. B-G (Filed Under Seal))(Related document(s) 85 ) (Chung, Megan) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
August 13, 2009 89 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Letter Brief re 85 Letter Brief,, Dated August 10, 2009, Public Version (correcting Docket #85) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit (s) B-G (Filed Under Seal))(Related document(s) 85 ) (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 8/13/2009) Modified on 8/14/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2009 87 Featured Case ORDER SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 85 Letter Brief, filed by Apple Inc.]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/11/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
August 11, 2009 86 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO SEAL LETTER BRIEF DATED 8/10/2009 [re 83 MOTION to Seal Document Miscellaneous Administrative Request For An Order Permitting The Filing Under Seal Of Confidential Portions of Letter Brief Dated August 10, 2009 filed by Apple Inc.]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/11/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
August 10, 2009 88 Letter Brief Dated August 10, 2009 (filed UNDER SEAL) filed by Apple Inc. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
August 10, 2009 85 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Letter Brief Dated August 10, 2009, Public Version, filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (Filed Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit C (Filed Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit D (Filed Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit E (Filed Under Seal), # 6 Exhibit F (Filed Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit G (Filed Under Seal))(Gilliland, James) (Filed on 8/10/2009) Modified on 8/13/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Main Document 85 replaced on 8/13/2009) (feriab, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2009 84 Declaration of Tyler J. Gee in Support of 83 MOTION to Seal Document Miscellaneous Administrative Request For An Order Permitting The Filing Under Seal Of Confidential Portions of Letter Brief Dated August 10, 2009 filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 83 ) (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
August 10, 2009 83 MOTION to Seal Document Miscellaneous Administrative Request For An Order Permitting The Filing Under Seal Of Confidential Portions of Letter Brief Dated August 10, 2009 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gilliland, James) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
July 27, 2009 82 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Alsup granting 81 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kiwi Alejandro Danao Camara. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2009)
July 24, 2009 80 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/24/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 23, 2009 81 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Kiwi Camara, Esq., ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611034688.) filed by Psystar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2009)
July 23, 2009 79 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 7/23/2009)
July 17, 2009 77 Featured Case ORDER PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL [granting 76 Motion to Substitute Attorney]. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
July 15, 2009 76 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Psystar Corporation. (Grewe, Christopher) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
July 10, 2009 75 Featured Case ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/10/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 9, 2009 78 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/9/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 7/9/2009). Jury Trial set for 1/11/2010 07:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2009 02:00 PM. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/9/2009)
July 9, 2009 74 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman for Mediation/Settlement; ORDER LIFTING STAY; Discovery due by 8/21/2009. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2010 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motions due by 10/8/2009. Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/9/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
July 2, 2009 73 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (SECOND JOINT) AND [PROPOSED] REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Apple Inc.. (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
June 26, 2009 72 CLERKS NOTICE Scheduling Hearing. Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2009 11:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2009. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2009)
June 25, 2009 71 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Entry of Order Granting Motion by Apple Inc. for Relief From Stay Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 362(d) (Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 1, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2009. Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2009 11:00 AM. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2009)
June 1, 2009 70 Featured Case ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 1, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2009)
May 26, 2009 69 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Psystar Corporation by Psystar Corporation. (Springer, Colby) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 8, 2009 68 Featured Case ORDER COMPELLING PSYSTAR'S PRODUCTION OF FINANCIAL DOCUMENTS AND 30(B)(6) DEPOSITION. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 8, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 8, 2009 66 Proposed Order re 59 Letter Brief, 61 Letter Brief [JOINT PROPOSED] ORDER COMPELLING PSYSTAR'S PRODUCTION OF FINANCIAL DOCUMENTS AND 30(B)(6) DEPOSITION by Apple Inc.. (Chung, Megan) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 7, 2009 65 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/05/2009, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2009. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
May 5, 2009 67 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 5/5/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/5/2009). Dft shall attachments produced by 5//18/09. Deposition shall be held at 9am on 6/3/09. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/5/2009)
May 5, 2009 62 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Alsup granting 57 Motion to Seal Document. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
May 4, 2009 61 Letter Brief dated May 4, 2009 in response to Plaintiff's Letter Brief Dated April 29, 2009 filed byPsystar Corporation. (Springer, Colby) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
May 1, 2009 60 Featured Case ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 59 Letter Brief, filed by Apple Inc.]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/1/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 29, 2009 64 FILED UNDER SEAL EXHIBITS A, B & D re 63 Letter Brief filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Related document(s) 63 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 29, 2009 63 FILED UNDER SEAL Letter Brief filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 29, 2009 59 Letter Brief Dated April 29, 2009 filed byApple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), # 2 Exhibit B (Filed Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D (Filed Under Seal))(Chung, Megan) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 29, 2009 58 AFFIDAVIT re 57 MOTION to Seal Document (Miscellaneous Administrative Request For An Order Permitting The Filing Under Seal Of Confidential Portions Of Letter Brief Dated April 29, 2009) MOTION to Seal Document (Miscellaneous Administrative Request For An Order Permitting The Filing Under Seal Of Confidential Portions Of Letter Brief Dated April 29, 2009) (Declaration of Megan M. Chung In Support of Administrative Request) by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Chung, Megan) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 29, 2009 57 MOTION to Seal Document (Miscellaneous Administrative Request For An Order Permitting The Filing Under Seal Of Confidential Portions Of Letter Brief Dated April 29, 2009) filed by Apple Inc.(a California corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Permitting The Filing Under Seal Of Confidential Portions Of Letter Brief Dated April 29, 2009)(Chung, Megan) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
March 4, 2009 56 ANSWER to Counterclaim OF PSYSTAR CORPORATION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AS TO THE UNENFORCEABILITY OF COPYRIGHTS byApple Inc.. (Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
March 3, 2009 55 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Alsup granting 54 Motion for Protective Order. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
February 25, 2009 54 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion to Enter Stipulated Protective Order filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Stipulated Protective Order and [Proposed] Order)(Chung, Megan) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 12, 2009 53 Amended COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Relief against Apple Inc.. Filed byPsystar Corporation. (Springer, Colby) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
February 6, 2009 52 Featured Case ORDER RE PSYSTAR'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COUNTERCLAIMS by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion for Leave to File (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 4, 2009 51 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-22-09, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2009. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
January 22, 2009 50 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/22/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 1/22/2009) re 35 MOTION for Leave to File AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Apple Inc., 40 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Counterclaim filed by Psystar Corporation. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/22/2009)
January 14, 2009 49 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 8, 2009 48 Reply to Opposition of Apple Inc. to Psystar Corporation's Motion for Leave to Amend its Counterclaims CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 47 filed byPsystar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Open Source Yoga)(Springer, Colby) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
January 7, 2009 47 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 48 . *** Reply to 44 Opposition of Apple Inc. to Psystar Corporation's Motion for Leave to Amend its Counterclaims filed byPsystar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Open Source Yoga (2005 WL 756558))(Springer, Colby) (Filed on 1/7/2009) Modified on 1/8/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/8/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
December 31, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Private ADR with Hon. Daniel Weinstein (Ret.) Mediation deadline extended to 2/18/2009. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2008)
December 31, 2008 46 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO COMPLETE MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 31, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2008)
December 30, 2008 45 STIPULATION Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Complete Mediation and [Proposed] Order Amending the Case Management Order to Reflect the Same by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
December 30, 2008 44 Memorandum in Opposition Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Psystar Corporation's Motion for Leave To Amend Its Counterclaims filed byApple Inc.. (Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
December 23, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 40 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Counterclaim. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2009 08:00 AM. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 23, 2008 43 Featured Case ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING ON PSYSTAR'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 23, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 22, 2008 42 STIPULATION re 40 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Counterclaim Joint Request and Stipulation to Reschedule Hearing on Psystar Corporation's Motion for Leave to Amend and [Proposed] Order Rescheduling Hearing on Psystar Corporation's Motion for Leave to Amend by Psystar Corporation. (Grewe, Christopher) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 16, 2008 41 Answer to Amended Complaint 38 Amended Complaint, Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Psystar Corporation to Apple Inc.'s First Amended Complaint byPsystar Corporation. (Grewe, Christopher) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
December 8, 2008 40 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Counterclaim filed by Psystar Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit First Amended Counterclaim, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Annotated Counterclaim, # 4 Exhibit Law Review Article)(Springer, Colby) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
December 5, 2008 39 Featured Case ORDER VACATING HEARING ON APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 4, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 2, 2008 38 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, INDUCED COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, VIOLATION OF DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT, BREACH OF CONTRACT, INDUCED BREACH OF CONTRACT, INDUCED BREACH OF CONTRACT, TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT, TRADE DRESS INFRINGEMENT AND UNFAIR COMPETITION against Apple Inc.. Filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Gilliland, James) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
December 2, 2008 37 STIPULATION CONSENTING TO APPLE INC'S FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER VACATING HEARING ON APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND by Apple Inc.. (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
November 26, 2008 36 Proposed Order re 35 MOTION for Leave to File AMENDED COMPLAINT by Apple Inc.. (Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 26, 2008 35 MOTION for Leave to File AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 18, 2008 33 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS by Judge Alsup granting 16 Motion to Dismiss (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 13, 2008 31 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 6, 2008, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/9/2009. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
November 7, 2008 30 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/26/2009. Jury Trial set for 11/9/2009 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motions due by 8/20/2009. Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/7/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 6, 2008 34 AMENDED Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/6/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/6/2008), Motion Hearing held on 11/6/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/6/2008) re 16 MOTION to Dismiss Psystar's Counterclaims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Apple Inc. Jury Trial set for 11/9/2009 07:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2009 02:00 PM. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/6/2008)
November 6, 2008 32 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/6/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/6/2008), Motion Hearing held on 11/6/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/6/2008) re 16 MOTION to Dismiss Psystar's Counterclaims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Apple Inc. Jury Trial set for 11/9/2009 07:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2009 02:00 PM. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/6/2008)
October 31, 2008 29 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing Time. Motion hearing and Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2008 02:00 PM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 30, 2008 28 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Apple Inc.. (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 23, 2008 27 Reply to Opposition re 16 MOTION to Dismiss Psystar's Counterclaims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Reply Declaration of James G. Gilliland, Jr., # 2 Exhibit 1 to Reply Declaration of James G. Gilliland, Jr., # 3 Exhibit 2 to Reply Declaration of James G. Gilliland, Jr.)(Gilliland, James) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 16, 2008 26 Declaration of Christopher P. Grewe, Esq. in Support of 25 Memorandum in Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss filed byPsystar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 25 ) (Grewe, Christopher) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 16, 2008 25 Memorandum in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Dismiss Psystar's Counterclaims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byPsystar Corporation. (Grewe, Christopher) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 13, 2008 24 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Springer, Colby) (Filed on 10/13/2008)
October 10, 2008 23 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing. Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2008 08:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 10/30/2008. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 2, 2008 22 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Apple Inc. (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
October 2, 2008 21 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
September 30, 2008 20 EXHIBIT B re 17 Request for Judicial Notice, filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 17 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 19 Proposed Order re 16 MOTION to Dismiss Psystar's Counterclaims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Apple Inc.. (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 18 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 17 Request for Judicial Notice, Manual Filing Notification of Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 17 Request for Judicial Notice re 16 MOTION to Dismiss Psystar's Counterclaims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Related document(s) 16 ) (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 16 MOTION to Dismiss Psystar's Counterclaims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2008 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 15, 2008 15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF AND COUNTERDEFENDANT APPLE INC TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIMS FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE SHERMAN, CLAYTON AND CARTWRIGHT ACTS, AND STATE AND COMMON UNFAIR COMPETITION LAW by Apple Inc.. (Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 12, 2008 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 11, 2008 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Psystar Corporation (Watson, Christine) (Filed on 9/11/2008)
August 28, 2008 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE SHERMAN, CLAYTON, AND CARTWRIGHT ACTS, AND STATE AND COMMON UNFAIR COMPETITION LAW against Apple Inc. byPsystar Corporation. (Springer, Colby) (Filed on 8/28/2008)
August 18, 2008 11 STIPULATION (SECOND) TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, BREACH OF CONTRACT, TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT, TRADE DRESS INFRINGEMENT, AND UNFAIR COMPETITION by Psystar Corporation. (Springer, Colby) (Filed on 8/18/2008)
July 31, 2008 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 7 8 by Apple Inc. of Clerk's Notice of Rescheduling Hearing and Supplemental Order to Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference in Civil Cases Before Judge William Alsup (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 7/31/2008) Modified on 8/1/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2008 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, BREACH OF CONTRACT, TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT, TRADE DRESS INFRINGEMENT, AND UNFAIR COMPETITION by Psystar Corporation. (Springer, Colby) (Filed on 7/28/2008)
July 21, 2008 8 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 7 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/21/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 21, 2008 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 10/23/2008 11:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 10/16/2008. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 18, 2008 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Apple Inc.. Psystar Corporation served on 7/8/2008, answer due 7/28/2008. (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 7/18/2008)
July 17, 2008 5 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William H. Alsup for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge James Larson no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/17/08. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2008)
July 16, 2008 4 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2008)
July 15, 2008 3 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc.. (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 7/15/2008)
July 3, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2008)
July 3, 2008 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2008. Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2008 10:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2008)
July 3, 2008 1 COMPLAINT; summons issued against Psystar Corporation (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611020943). Filed by Apple Inc. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2008) (ga, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. Psystar Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]