Medway v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Jacob Medway
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00330
Filed: January 26, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2009 10
STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Apple, Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 17, 2009 11
NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Need for ADR Telephone Conference (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 17, 2009 12
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Mansfield, Alan) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 24, 2009 13
NOTICE by James R. Pittman OF RELATED CASES (Fauth, Gordon) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 25, 2009 14
Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 26, 2009 15
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 1
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Damages & Equitable Relief & Jury Trial Demanded - [Summons Issued] against Apple, Inc., [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 346110227990] Filed by Plaintiff Jacob Medway. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 2
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Apple, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 3
ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 4/27/2009 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 5/4/2009 at 4:00 PM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 4
DECLARATION of Marc L. Godino Pursuant to California Civil Code Section 1780(c) Filed by Plaintiff Jacob Medway. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 5
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties Filed by Plaintiff Jacob Medway Identifying Other Affiliate Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP for Jacob Medway. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 28, 2009 6
CLERKS NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2009 04:00 PM. Case Management Statement due by 5/11/2009. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 29, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/29/09. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
February 2, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court
INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 5/8/2009 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2009.. Signed by Judge Jeffery S. White on 2/2/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
February 13, 2009 9
NOTICE by Jacob Medway OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT APPLE, INC. (Binkow, Peter) (Filed on 2/13/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medway v. Apple, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Medway
Represented By: Marc Lawrence Godino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]