Solis v. Local 87 Service Employees International Union

Plaintiff: Hilda L. Solis
Defendant: Local 87 Service Employees International Union
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv02051
Filed: May 11, 2009
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29:0401 Labor Management Disclosure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2009 14 Featured Case COURT NOTICE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/20/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
October 14, 2009 17 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Laporte on 10/14/09. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
April 12, 2010 20 Featured Case CONSENT DECREE AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 12, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
May 11, 2009 3 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 2 ADR Scheduling Order (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Solis v. Local 87 Service Employees International Union
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda L. Solis
Represented By: Steven J. Saltiel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 87 Service Employees International Union
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]