Trans Video Electronics , Ltd. v. Sony Electronics Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Trans Video Electronics , Ltd.
Defendant: Sony Electronics Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. and Sony Corporation
Case Number: 3:2009cv03304
Filed: July 20, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2011 108 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER modifying Claim Construction briefing schedules; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/29/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 30, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel denying 89 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment without prejudice (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
May 5, 2011 117 Opinion or Order of the Court EQUIPMENT ORDER (defendants); Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/5/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
May 18, 2011 119 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/18/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
October 14, 2011 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 124 Sony's Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
August 19, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 6 plaintiff's Motion for attorney Zachary D Silbersher to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
November 15, 2011 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 136 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 16, 2011 149 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND re 147 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/16/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
August 27, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER NOT RELATING CASE C08-4479-BZ AND C09-3304-MHP.Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/27/2009. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
December 14, 2011 153 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 152 Stipulation filed by Trans Video Electronics, Ltd.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/14/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
October 16, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Trans Video to respond to counterclaims; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/16/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
March 26, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Defendants' Motion to Stay: Defendants' motion to stay this action is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; This action is stayed, subject to the following, limited exception: The parties may continue to conduct discovery related to claim construction of the 801 patent; The parties are to notify the court within ten (10) days of any action taken by the USPTO with respect to the two pending requests for reexamination; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/26/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
January 21, 2011 83 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: Further Case Management Conference CONTINUED TO 2/14/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/21/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trans Video Electronics , Ltd. v. Sony Electronics Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trans Video Electronics , Ltd.
Represented By: Matthew K Blackburn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Electronics Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Computer Entertainment Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]