Intermec Technologies Corp. v. Palm, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Intermec Technologies Corp.
Defendant: Palm, Inc.
Miscellaneous: Google Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009mc80097
Filed: May 8, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2009 34 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 15, 2009, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Christine A. Triska, CSR, Telephone number (650) 743-8425. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2009. (cat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 10, 2009 33 NOTICE by Intermec Technologies Corp. re Payment of Fees (Mooney, Richard) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
July 15, 2009 32 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Intermec Technologies Corp. for proceedings held on 5/15/2009, Court Reporter Christine Triska. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
June 19, 2009 31 USCA Case Number 09-16281 USCA Ninth Circuit for 30 Notice of Appeal filed by Intermec Technologies Corp. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 15, 2009 30 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 27 Order, 29 Order, 10 Order by Intermec Technologies Corp. Filing fee $ 455; Receipt No. 34611033231. (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Docketing Statement)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2009: # 2 USCA Case Number 09-16281) (ls, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2009 29 Featured Case ORDER RE PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 10, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
June 9, 2009 28 Response re 27 Order June 2, 2009 byIntermec Technologies Corp.. (Mooney, Richard) (Filed on 6/9/2009)
June 2, 2009 27 AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 2, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2009)
May 29, 2009 26 EXHIBITS re 15 Response ( Non Motion ) Exh K filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 25 EXHIBITS re 15 Response ( Non Motion ) Exh J filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 24 EXHIBITS re 15 Response ( Non Motion ) Exh I filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 23 EXHIBITS re 15 Response ( Non Motion ) Exh H filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 22 EXHIBITS re 15 Response ( Non Motion ) Exh G filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 21 EXHIBITS re 15 Response ( Non Motion ) Exh F filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 20 EXHIBITS re 15 Response ( Non Motion ) Exh E filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 19 EXHIBITS re 15 Response ( Non Motion ) Exh D filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 18 EXHIBITS re 15 Response ( Non Motion ) Exh C filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 17 EXHIBITS re 15 Response ( Non Motion ) Exh B filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 16 EXHIBITS re 15 Response ( Non Motion ) Exh A filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 15 DECLARATION OF SCOTT WEINGAERTNER to re 14 Response ( Non Motion ) Declaration of Scott Weingaertner In Support Of Opposition To Intermec's Response to Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions by Google Inc.. (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 5/29/2009).
May 29, 2009 14 RESPONSE to re 13 Response in Support Opposition To Intermec's Response To Order To Show Cause Re Sanctions by Google Inc.. (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 26, 2009 13 RESPONSE in Support Response to Order to Show Cause re Sanctions filed byIntermec Technologies Corp.. (Mooney, Richard) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 26, 2009 12 Declaration of Jeffrey Hansen in Support of Intermec Response to Order to Show Cause re Sanctions filed byIntermec Technologies Corp.. (Mooney, Richard) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 15, 2009 11 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 15, 2009, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Christine Triska, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (650) 743-8425. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2009. (cat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 15, 2009 10 Featured Case ORDER QUASHING SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM IN ITS ENTIRETY AND GRANTING PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge William Alsup [granting 1 Motion for Protective Order]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 15, 2009 9 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/15/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/15/2009) re 1 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Google Inc. Matter taken under submission. The Court will issue an order. (Court Reporter Christine Triska.) (fj, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/15/2009)
May 12, 2009 8 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Alsup granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Admission of Attorney Weingaertner. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 12, 2009 7 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on 1 MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2009, 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 12, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 11, 2009 6 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Alsup for all further proceedings. Hon. Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/11/-09. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
May 8, 2009 5 PROOF OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 1 MOTION for Protective Order, Proposed Order, 2 Memorandum in Support, Proposed Order, 3 Declaration in Support, 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611031973.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 8, 2009 Proposed Order re 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Scott T. Weingaertner) ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611031973.) by Google Inc. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 8, 2009 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Scott T. Weingaertner) ( Filing fee paid $ 210.00, receipt number 34611031973.) filed by Google Inc. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 8, 2009 Proposed Order Granting NonParty Google Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order re 1 by Google Inc. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 8, 2009 3 Declaration of Anuradha Gokhale in Support of Google Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order and Motion To Quash Rule 45 Subpoena 1 filed by Google Inc. (Related document(s) 1 ) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 8, 2009 2 Memorandum in Support of NonParty Google Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order and Motion To Quash Rule 45 Subpoena re 1 filed by Google Inc. (Related document(s) 1 ) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 8, 2009 1 Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Quash Rule 45 Subpoena filed by Google Inc. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009) Filing Fee Paid along with Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid $249.00. Receipt Number 34611031973.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intermec Technologies Corp. v. Palm, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intermec Technologies Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palm, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Google Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Kobialka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]